Jostad v. May Trucking Company

Plaintiff: David Jostad
Defendant: May Trucking Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00031
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by May Trucking Company. (Cook, Nena)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by May Trucking Company. (Cook, Nena)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon May Trucking Company served on 1/14/2019 Filed by David Jostad. (Sullivan, Dana)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to May Trucking Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 1/8/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5693465 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by David Jostad against May Trucking Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sullivan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jostad v. May Trucking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jostad
Represented By: Dana L. Sullivan
Represented By: Alysa Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Trucking Company
Represented By: Nena Cook
Represented By: Alexandra M. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?