Pierce v. Walmart Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brad Pierce
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Case Number: 6:2019cv00036
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Rule 16 Conference is set for 3/18/2019 at 11:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call-in number by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Barhoum, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Barhoum, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Jeffrey W. Hansen in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavits of Service) (Barhoum, John)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/10/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV55701 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5695043 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Attachments: #1 Attachment Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Pierce
Represented By: Scott J. Mahady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?