Meriweather v. Laney

Petitioner: Thomas Nicholas Meriweather
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2019cv00059
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Boyd, Kristen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Petitioners Motion to Defer Filing Fee (#1 ) is granted and the filing fee paid January 30, 2019 is considered timely. Answer is due by 4/15/2019. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha) (Copy of Order Mailed to Petitioner.)
January 30, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 81908 issued. (jn)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Thomas Nicholas Meriweather against Garrett Laney (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Petition, #2 Exhibits). (joha)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Motion to Defer Filing Fee. Filed by Thomas Nicholas Meriweather. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meriweather v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Nicholas Meriweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?