Duncan v. Eugene School District 4J
Plaintiff: Riley Duncan
Defendant: Eugene School District 4J
Case Number: 6:2019cv00065
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (kf)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint . Filed by Riley Duncan. (Sherman, Kimberly) Modified motion type to more specific extension of time to answer on 3/15/2019; attorneys noticed. (kf)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge Filed by Riley Duncan. (Sherman, Kimberly)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eugene School District 4J waiver sent on 1/25/2019. Filed by Eugene School District 4J. (Jacobson, Rebekah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eugene School District 4J waiver sent on 1/22/2019. Filed by Riley Duncan. (Sherman, Kimberly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Eugene School District 4J. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Riley Duncan. (Sherman, Kimberly)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 1/15/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/15/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/14/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/14/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5701147 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Riley Duncan against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Sherman, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Eugene School District 4J
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene School District 4J
Represented By: Rebekah R. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Duncan
Represented By: Kimberly Hope Sherman
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?