Simpson et al v. Alexander et al
Plaintiff: James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga, Henry Smith and Claude D. Simpson
Defendant: Alexanders' Tortfeasor-Clientele, John Alexander and Sandy Alexander
Case Number: 6:2019cv00154
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #16 . Case Appealed to Ninth Circuit Case Number 19-35230 assigned. (kf)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Order #15 . Order Granting motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #11 , Order Granting motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #9 , Order Granting motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #10 (DC IFP Granted). Filed by James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga, Claude D. Simpson, Henry Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (kf)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs may submit an amended complaint stating proper grounds for jurisdiction and identifying the Defendants as directed. Plaintiffs are advised that failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed on 3/18/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 3/18/2019.) (cp)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order regarding Summons Issued #13 : The summons in this case were issued on 3/14/2019 in error and are ordered stricken. The U.S. Marshal is ordered withhold process and service of the summons until further order of this Court. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/18/2019.) (cp) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct docket text (cp).
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN ***Summons Issued at Intake at the time of filing as to John Alexander, Sandy Alexander, Alexanders' Tortfeasor-Clientele. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Orders to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service. Please note: Multiple summons provided listing same named parties with different addresses. Forwarded the different addressed documents attached to USM285 forms, because the forms referenced them for locations to serve; only issued one summons for named defendants.) (kf) Modified on 3/19/2019 (cp).
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Protections filed by James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga, Claude D. Simpson, Henry Smith. (kf)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #4 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to plaintiffs) (cp)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy Mailed to Plaintiffs) (cp)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to plaintiff) (cp)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #5 sent to Smith returned as Unable to Forward. Mailed to correct zip code today for Smith. Also resent to plaintiff James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga (same mailing address). (kf)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #5 sent to Simpson returned not deliverable as addressed. (Clarification was made by phone call from filers on a missing number; mailed to correct zip code today.) (kf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Case Assignment Notice #5 to Simpson, Smith, Arunga. (kf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP filed by James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga. (kf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP filed by Henry Smith. (kf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP filed by Claude D. Simpson. (kf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Claude D. Simpson, James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga, Henry Smith against John Alexander, Sandy Alexander, Alexanders' Tortfeasor-Clientele (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Alexander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aggrey-Kweggyir Arunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude D. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexanders' Tortfeasor-Clientele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?