Hix v. Whitaker et al
Plaintiff: Steven Randolph Hix, Jr.
Defendant: Ellen Rosenblum and Matthew G. Whitaker
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero, Stanley Dawidowicz, Lawrence L. Favero, Karin Tang, Pamela Molnar, Mark Agro, Melissa Bazzy, Douglas Leigh Hughes and Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Case Number: 6:2019cv00190
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to Join. Expedited Jury Trial. Filed by Pamela Molnar. (kf)
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Steven Randolph Hix Jr. regarding Motion for Joinder #23 . (bd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 Amended Petition to Join. Filed by Melissa Bazzy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment). (bd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (White, Tracy)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Steven Randolph Hix Jr. regarding Motion for Joinder #19 and Motion for Joinder #20 . (bd)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to Join. Filed by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (bd)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to Join. Filed by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (bd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Steven Randolph Hix Jr. regarding Motion for Joinder #16 and Motion for Joinder #17 . (bd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 Petition to Join. Filed by Karin Tang. (bd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 Petition to Join. Filed by Stanley Dawidowicz. (bd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Steven Randolph Hix Jr. regarding Motion for Joinder #13 and Motion for Joinder #14 . (bd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 Motion for Joinder. Filed by Rhonda T. Favero. (bd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 Petition to Join. Filed by Lawrence L. Favero. (bd) Modified on 3/1/2019 to correct the file date. (bd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Steven Randolph Hix, Jr. regarding Motion for Joinder #9 , Motion for Joinder #7 and Motion for Joinder #10 . (ck)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Petition to Join. Filed by Mark Agro. (bd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Petition to Join. Filed by Pamela Molnar. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (bd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Request to End Abuses. Filed by Steven Randolph Hix, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment) (bd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Petition to Join. Filed by Melissa Bazzy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (bd)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 2/8/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. A copy of this Order was mailed to pro se plaintiff Steven Randolph Hix, Jr. (ck)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Hix regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order #4 . (bd)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ellen Rosenblum. (bd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Matthew G. Whitaker. (bd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 12772. Summons issued as to Matthew G. Whitaker and Ellen Rosenblum. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Steven Randolph Hix, Jr. against Ellen Rosenblum, Matthew G. Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Complaint Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment). (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hix v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Rosenblum
Represented By: Tracy Ickes White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Randolph Hix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Dawidowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karin Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Molnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Agro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa Bazzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Leigh Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?