Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc. v. Imagination International, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.
Respondent: Hillary Darland, Imagination International, Inc., Takuma Takahara and John Darland
Case Number: 6:2019cv00237
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 43 Reply to Motion to Strike Motion for Order Directing Binding Arbitration in Eugene, Oregon #34 #36 . Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Sands, Darin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 42 Response in Opposition to Motion for Order Directing Binding Arbitration in Eugene, Oregon #34 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Sands, Darin)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Granting Motion to Seal #39 the document filed at ECF No. 3-5. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 40 Proposed Form of Order Submitted re Unopposed Motion to Seal. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Sands, Darin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Sands, Darin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike Motion for Order Directing Binding Arbitration in Eugene, Oregon #34 #36 . Filed by All Defendants. (Churnside, Donald)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting Motion for a Protective Order #32 . Signed on 4/1/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 36 Motion to Strike Motion for Order Directing Binding Arbitration in Eugene, Oregon #34 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Sands, Darin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 35 Declaration of John Darland in Support of Motion for Order Directing Binding Arbitration in Eugene, Oregon. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Order #34 .) (Churnside, Donald)
March 28, 2019 Filing 34 Motion for Order Directing Binding Arbitration in Eugene, Oregon. Filed by All Defendants. (Churnside, Donald)
March 15, 2019 Filing 33 Reply in Support of Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 .) (Huggler, Hans)
March 14, 2019 Filing 32 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Denying Petition for Immediate Provisional Process #2 . Signed on 3/8/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration and Petition for Immediate Provisional Process Order and Show Cause Hearing. Filed by All Defendants. (Churnside, Donald)
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 Supplement Authority in Support of Petition for Immediate Provisional Process Order and Show Cause Hearing. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition, #2 .) (Sands, Darin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTES of Proceedings: Show Cause Hearing held in Portland by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane on 2/27/2019. The matter is argued and the petition taken under advisement as of 2/27/2019. Darin M. Sands, Hans N. Huggler and Masayuki Yamaguchi present as counsel for petitioner. Donald J. Churnside present as counsel for respondents. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway, (503) 326-8188. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (gw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 Response to #2 Petition, . Filed by Takuma Takahara, John Darland, Hillary Darland, Imagination International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment) (Churnside, Donald)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to weather conditions in Eugene, RESETTING the Show Cause Hearing from 2/25/2019 to Wednesday, 2/27/2019, at 03:30 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The conference call-in numbers will be provided by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (gw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTES of Proceedings: Scheduling Conference held. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/25/2019 is rescheduled for Wednesday, 2/27/2019, at 03:30 PM by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The conference call-in number will be sent to the parties by separate email. Darin M. Sands present as counsel for plaintiff. Donald Churnside present as counsel for defendants. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (Copy emailed to defense counsel, Donald Churnside) (cp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 24 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Hillary Darland, John Darland, Imagination International, Inc., Takuma Takahara. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 Amended Proposed Summons Takuma Takahara Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 Amended Proposed Summons Hillary Darland Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 Amended Proposed Summons John Darland Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 Amended Proposed Summons Imagination International, Inc. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 Affidavit of Ruth Peake in support of Petitions to Compel Arbitration and for Provisional Process. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 , Petition, #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Huggler, Hans)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 Supplemental Affidavit of Atsushi Yanai in support of Petitions to Compel Arbitration and for Provisional Process. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 , Petition, #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6) (Huggler, Hans)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Donald Churnside, Counsel for Defendant regarding Order to Show Cause #16 . (cp)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order: Respondents shall appear at the Wayne Morse Federal Courthouse at 3:00 p.m. on Monday, February 25 to show cause why provisional process should not issue restraining respondents from transferring or selling any TMP products, and why such provisional relief should not remain in place until the completion of the arbitration proceedings. The hearing will be in Judge McShanes Courtroom number 2. Respondents may file affidavits or declarations with the court and may present testimony at the hearing. If the respondents do not appear at the hearing, the court may order issuance of the specific provisional process sought. Signed on 2/21/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane regarding Petition #2 . Show Cause Hearing is set for 2/25/2019 at 03:00PM in Eugene Courtroom 2 before Judge Michael J. McShane. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Sands, Darin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5741573. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Debra Bolton Related Doc #11 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (ljp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Hillary Darland, John Darland, Imagination International, Inc., Takuma Takahara. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Petition, #2 (for Immediate Provisional Process Order and Show Cause Hearing). Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/19/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons (Takuma Takahara) Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons (Hillary Darland) Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons (John Darland) Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons (Imagination International, Inc.) Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Huggler, Hans)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 3/1/2019. (ljp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Masayuki Yamaguchi in support of Petitions to Compel Arbitration and for Provisional Process. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 , Petition, #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sands, Darin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Atsushi Yanai in support of Petitions to Compel Arbitration and for Provisional Process. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition, #2 , Petition, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Sands, Darin) [Exhibit 3 Restricted Temporarily Pending Order on 4/10/2019 (joha).]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Immediate Provisional Process Order and Show Cause Hearing (under Oregon Rule 83) Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5741573. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc. against Hillary Darland, John Darland, Imagination International, Inc., Takuma Takahara. (Sands, Darin) Modified on 3/8/2019 to make this a motion(cp).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5741548. Filed by Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc. against Hillary Darland, John Darland, Imagination International, Inc., Takuma Takahara (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sands, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc. v. Imagination International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc.
Represented By: Darin M. Sands
Represented By: Masayuki Yamaguchi
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hillary Darland
Represented By: Donald J. Churnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Imagination International, Inc.
Represented By: Donald J. Churnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Takuma Takahara
Represented By: Donald J. Churnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Darland
Represented By: Donald J. Churnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?