Marrafino v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Marrafino
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc. and Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00311
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 84 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Adrienne Franco Busby; Erin Linder Hanig; J Joseph Tanner; John D LaDue; Stephanie N Russo regarding Order 83 . (jk)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: The court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report #78 and adopts the proposed schedule where the parties have an agreed date. For Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the court adopts 5/22/2020 as the deadline. Previous deadlines are vacated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 82 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Adrienne Franco Busby; Erin Linder Hanig; J Joseph Tanner; John D LaDue; Stephanie N Russo regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice #80 . (ck)
April 29, 2019 Filing 81 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Tayjes Shah (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tshah. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tayjes Shah for Cynthia Marraffino. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 83417 issued. Signed on 4/29/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (ck)
April 23, 2019 Filing 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tayjes Shah. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 83417. Filed by Cynthia Marrafino. (ecp)
April 19, 2019 Filing 78 Joint Status Report and Scheduling Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Perkins, Heather)
April 19, 2019 Filing 77 Notice of Appearance of Timothy L. Williams appearing on behalf of Cynthia Marrafino Filed by on behalf of Cynthia Marrafino. (Williams, Timothy)
April 17, 2019 Filing 76 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Adrienne Franco Busby; Erin Linder Hanig; J Joseph Tanner; John D LaDue; Stephanie N Russo; Tayjes M Shah PHV regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice #74 . (ck)
April 17, 2019 Filing 75 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Heather Carson Perkins (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: hcperkins. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather Carson Perkins for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5808607 issued. Signed on 4/15/2019 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ck)
April 15, 2019 Filing 73 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Adrienne Franco Busby; Erin Linder Hanig; J Joseph Tanner; John D LaDue; Stephanie N Russo; Tayjes M Shah PHV regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice #71 . (ck)
April 15, 2019 Filing 72 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Mary Hershewe (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mhershewe. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary Hershewe for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5808593 issued. Signed on 4/15/2019 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ck)
April 11, 2019 Filing 70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heather Carson Perkins . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5808607. Filed by All Defendants. (Hamlin, Bruce)
April 11, 2019 Filing 69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary Hershewe . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5808593. Filed by All Defendants. (Hamlin, Bruce)
April 5, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Association of Attorney Hans N. Huggler,Hans N. Huggler for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC,Hans N. Huggler for Biomet, Inc.,Hans N. Huggler for Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. Filed by All Defendants. (Huggler, Hans)
April 4, 2019 Filing 67 Notice of Appearance of Bruce C. Hamlin appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Hamlin, Bruce)
March 22, 2019 Filing 66 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Adrienne Franco Busby; Erin Linder Hanig; J Joseph Tanner; John D LaDue; Stephanie N Russo; Tayjes M Shah PHV of Scheduling Order 65 . (jk)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Scheduling Order: The parties are ordered to confer and submit a joint status report in which they propose a scheduling order outlining any non-duplicative case-specific depositions, and any non-duplicative case-specific expert witness related discovery to be completed. The parties should include proposed deadlines for submitting dispositive motions, and/or pretrial motions in the joint status report. Joint Status Report is due by 4/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (eo) Copy forwarded to out of state counsel listed on INND docket sheet by e-mail.
March 4, 2019 Filing 63 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00132. Electronic file received.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 GROUP 3 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the District of Oregon. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/22/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 60 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 58 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 48 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 45 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 41 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 39 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 38 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 31 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 28 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER The Joint Motion to Amend Group 5 Case List 3491 is GRANTED, and the the pool of cases listed on Amended Exhibit A is SUBSTITUTED as Group 5 for case-specific discovery. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw 19 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/31/2017. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 20 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 28, 2017 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR APRIL 24, 2017 PRO SE HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE Brenda Fulmer appeared for the plaintiffs; John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Linder Hanig appeared for the defendants. Topics addressed included the pro se and Metal-on-Polyethylene (MoP) cases, active case count, status of discovery in Groups 3 and 4, and pending motions with actions taken in specific case as set forth in the Order. The next status conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 am (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 10 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dfts appeared by atty John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Hanig. Roland Jarquio appears on behalf of Nabileh & Ramon Jarquio (3:13cv933). The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the April 24, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 28, 2017 Filing 8 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Ahmed Diab, Brenda Fulmer, and Justin Presnal. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig, and John LaDue. The parties advised the court on the status of active/unresolved cases and discovery; indicated that they had reached an agreement regarding the composition of Group 4 for discovery purposes and would be submitting a proposed order by early April, with scheduling deadlines to be determined by the court; and confirmed that the hearing regarding management of the remaining pro se cases would proceed as scheduled on April 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). The court set the next status conference for April 24, 2017, following the pro se case management hearing. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the March 28, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER On the courts own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference currently set for February 27, 2017 is RESET for Tuesday, March 28, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE by Cynthia Marrafino Notice of Related Case (Shah PHV, Tayjes) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Cynthia Marrafino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Shah PHV, Tayjes) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrafino v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: Mary Hershewe
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Bruce C. Hamlin
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: Mary Hershewe
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Bruce C. Hamlin
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Mary Hershewe
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Bruce C. Hamlin
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Marrafino
Represented By: Tayjes M Shah PHV
Represented By: Tayjes M Shah
Represented By: Timothy L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?