State of Oregon et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Nevada, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Wisconsin, District of Columbia, State of Michigan, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of New York, State of Hawaii and State of New Jersey
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Office of Population Affairs
Consolidated Plaintiff: Oregon Medical Association, Planned Parenthood of Southwestern Oregon, American Medical Association, C.N.M. Michele P. Megregian, Thomas N. Ewing, M.D., Planned Parenthood Columbia Willamette and Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, City of Los Angeles, City of San Francisco, Kentucky (by and through its Governor), City of Chicago, State of Indiana, City of Houston, State of South Carolina, State of Arkansas, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, City of Baltimore, City of Flint, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, State of Kansas, City of New York, City of Seattle, State of Louisiana, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, State of South Dakota, City of Santa Cruz, State of Missouri, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Public Health Association, County of San Francisco, American Academy of Pediatrics, State of Tennessee, American Center for Law and Justice, SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST, City of Bloomington, Alabama, City of Columbus, State of Ohio, Academics, County of Santa Clara, State of Oklahoma, State Of Texas, City of Oakland and American College of Physicians
Case Number: 6:2019cv00317
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 147 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the complaints. Filed by All Defendants.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Bernie, Andrew)
May 2, 2019 Filing 146 Notice Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Merritt, R.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 145 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Filed by State of New Jersey.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Cahall, Kimberly)
April 30, 2019 Filing 144 Notice of Appearance of Amber J. Sizemore appearing on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Filed by on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Sizemore, Amber)
April 30, 2019 Filing 143 Notice of Appearance of Fadwa A. Hammoud appearing on behalf of State of Michigan Filed by on behalf of State of Michigan.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Hammoud, Fadwa)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction ( #35 in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC) and ( #42 ) in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC) are granted in full. Defendants and their agents and officers, are restrained from implementing or enforcing any portion of the Final Rule detailed in 84 Fed. Reg. 7714-7791 (March 4, 2019) and shall preserve the status quo under the current regulations pending further order from the Court. No bond is required. Signed on 4/29/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (cp)
April 26, 2019 Filing 141 Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey M. Conner appearing on behalf of State of Nevada Filed by on behalf of State of Nevada.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Conner, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 140 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/23/2019 before Judge Michael J. McShane, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 5/3/2019. Redaction Request due 5/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2019. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Shumway, Bonita)
April 26, 2019 Filing 139 Joint Reply to Defendants' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (131 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC) Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendants' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice, (131 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Beatty-Walters, Christina) Modified from notice to reply on 4/30/2019; attorneys noticed. (kf)
April 26, 2019 Filing 138 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (137 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 130 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice (137 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 130 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Merritt, R.) Modified from notice to response on 4/30/2019; attorneys noticed. (kf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 137 Notice re Motion for Preliminary Injunction(35 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC) of Supplemental Authority Filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(35 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
April 23, 2019 Filing 136 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument held regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction ( #35 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC, #42 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC). Motion is taken under advisement as of 4/23/2019. Written opinion to follow. Ellen Rosenblum, Christina L. Beatty-Walters, Scott J. Kaplan, Ming-Qi Chu, Lisa Landau, and Brittany M. Jones, present in Court as counsel for plaintiffs. R. Charlie Merritt and Andrew M. Bernie, present in Court as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (jp)
April 23, 2019 Filing 135 Notification of CM/ECF Account for T. Reed Stephens (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: trstephens. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of T Reed Stephens for Academics, American Public Health Association. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806173 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of T Reed Stephens for Academics, American Public Health Association. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806173 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/23/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 23, 2019 Filing 129 Notice of Appearance of Nikole N. Brock appearing on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Filed by on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Brock, Nikole)
April 23, 2019 Filing 128 Notice of Appearance of Toni L. Harris appearing on behalf of State of Michigan Filed by on behalf of State of Michigan.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Harris, Toni)
April 22, 2019 Filing 127 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Adam S. Hochschild (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ahochschild. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam S. Hochschild for SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5821775 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam S. Hochschild for SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5821775 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/22/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 22, 2019 Filing 125 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam S. Hochschild resubmitting Dkt #113 (lead case) & Dkt. 106 (trailing case). Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5821775. Filed by SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Grey, Herbert) Modified typo on 4/29/2019 (kf).
April 22, 2019 Filing 124 Notice of Appearance of Kate Matuschak appearing on behalf of State of New York Filed by on behalf of State of New York.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Matuschak, Kate)
April 19, 2019 Filing 123 Supplemental Declaration of Melissa Weiler Gerber in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,, (121 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 118 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
April 19, 2019 Filing 122 Supplemental Declaration of Bruce S. Anderson, Ph.D. in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion,, (121 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 118 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
April 19, 2019 Filing 121 Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (35 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
April 19, 2019 Filing 120 Supplemental Declaration of Kimberly Custer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by American Medical Association, Thomas N. Ewing, M.D., Michele P. Megregian, C.N.M., Oregon Medical Association, Planned Parenthood Columbia Willamette, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood of Southwestern Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(42 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Sacks, Jeremy)
April 19, 2019 Filing 119 Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (42 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC). Filed by American Medical Association, Thomas N. Ewing, M.D., Michele P. Megregian, C.N.M., Oregon Medical Association, Planned Parenthood Columbia Willamette, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood of Southwestern Oregon.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Sacks, Jeremy)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Order: The parties agreed to the filing of all Amicus Briefs. All pending motions for leave to file brief as amici curiae are GRANTED. The parties are reminded to file all briefs and pleadings in the lead case (6:19-cv-00317-MC). Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (cp)
April 18, 2019 Filing 133 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Amandeep Singh Sidhu (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: asidhu. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amandeep Singh Sidhu for Academics, American Public Health Association. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806168 issued. Signed on 4/18/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
April 18, 2019 Filing 117 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Sarah E. Pitlyk (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: spitlyk. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E. Pitlyk for SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5815147 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E. Pitlyk for SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5815147 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/18/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 18, 2019 Filing 115 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jay Alan Sekulow (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jsekulow. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay Alan Sekulow for American Center for Law and Justice. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5812289 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay Alan Sekulow for American Center for Law and Justice. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5812289 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/18/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC. (ck)
April 17, 2019 Filing 131 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Emre N. Ilter (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: eilter. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emre N. Ilter for Academics, American Public Health Association. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806133 issued. Signed on 4/17/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
April 17, 2019 Filing 113 Amicus Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Grey, Herbert)
April 17, 2019 Filing 112 Amicus Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sarah Pitlyk . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5815147. Filed by SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Grey, Herbert)
April 17, 2019 Filing 111 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Grey, Herbert)
April 15, 2019 Filing 110 Notice of Appearance of Ming-Qi Chu appearing on behalf of State of New York Filed by on behalf of State of New York.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Chu, Ming-Qi)
April 15, 2019 Filing 109 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Jeffrey A. Trautman on behalf of American Center for Law and Justice . Filed by on behalf of American Center for Law and Justice. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Trautman, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 108 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by American Center for Law and Justice.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Trautman, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 107 Amicus Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jay Alan Sekulow . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5812289. Filed by American Center for Law and Justice.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Trautman, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2019 Filing 106 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Madison Condon (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mcondon. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madison Condon for Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5804209 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madison Condon for Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5804209 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 104 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jason A. Schwartz (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jschwartz. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason A. Schwartz for Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5804184 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason A. Schwartz for Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5804184 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 102 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dhdriemeier. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806314 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806314 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 100 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Catherine Djang (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cdjang. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine J. Djang for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806311 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine J. Djang for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806311 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 98 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Lisa H. Bebchick (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: lbebchick. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa H. Bebchick for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806307 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa H. Bebchick for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806307 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 96 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Haley Eagon (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: heagon. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Haley Eagon for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806306 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Haley Eagon for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806306 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 94 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Daniel W. Richards (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: drichards. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel W. Richards for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806303 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel W. Richards for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806303 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 12, 2019 Filing 92 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Thomas N. Bulleit (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tbulleit. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas N. Bulleit for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5806300 issued in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas N. Bulleit for American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Receipt No. 0979-5806300 issued in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (ck)
April 11, 2019 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (35 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC), Motion for Preliminary Injunction (42 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC). Filed by All Defendants.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Bernie, Andrew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 89 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by Alabama, State of Arkansas, Kentucky (by and through its Governor), State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Dakota, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Missouri, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Flowers, Benjamin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance of Benjamin M. Flowers appearing on behalf of State of Ohio, Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, Kentucky (by and through its Governor), State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State Of Texas Filed by on behalf of State of Ohio, Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, Kentucky (by and through its Governor), State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State Of Texas.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Flowers, Benjamin)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae (78) in case 6:19-cv-00317-MC; Granting Motion for Leave (71) in case 6:19-cv-00318-MC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (cp)
April 10, 2019 Filing 86 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding (77 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC) The event code was corrected from Amicus Brief to Motion for Leave to Appear and docket text amended. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (jn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5806314. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Catherine J. Djang . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5806311. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa H. Bebchick . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5806307. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Haley Eagon . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5806306. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel W. Richards . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5806303. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas N. Bulleit . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5806300. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 79 Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave, (71 in 6:19-cv-00318-MC, 78 in 6:19-cv-00317-MC).)Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 78 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Academy of Family Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Dahab, Nadia)
April 9, 2019 Filing 77 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae and to File Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction entered by Harry B. Wilson on behalf of City of New York, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, City of San Francisco, County of San Francisco, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of Los Angeles, County of Santa Clara, City of Bloomington, City of Flint, City of Houston, City of Oakland, City of Santa Cruz, City of Seattle . Filed by on behalf of City of New York, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, City of San Francisco, County of San Francisco, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of Los Angeles, County of Santa Clara, City of Bloomington, City of Flint, City of Houston, City of Oakland, City of Santa Cruz, City of Seattle. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Wilson, Harry) Modified on 4/9/2019 to correct docket text (jn).
April 8, 2019 Filing 76 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Madison Condon . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5804209. Filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Kalmanson, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason A. Schwartz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5804184. Filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Kalmanson, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 74 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae and to File Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Kalmanson, Matthew)
April 5, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Leigh Richie Filed by State of Illinois.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Richie, Leigh)
April 3, 2019 Filing 72 Joint Notice of Blanket Consent to the Filing of Amicus Briefs Filed by American Medical Association, Thomas N. Ewing, M.D., Michele P. Megregian, C.N.M., Oregon Medical Association, Planned Parenthood Columbia Willamette, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood of Southwestern Oregon.Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00317-MC, 6:19-cv-00318-MC (Sacks, Jeremy)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Consolidate #34 for pretrial proceedings with (6:19-cv-00318-MC). Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 21, 2019 Filing 69 Declaration of Dr. Cheryl Zoll, PhD in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 68 Declaration of Walker Wilson in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 67 Declaration of Vanessa Walker Harris, MD in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 66 Declaration of Lauren Tobias in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 65 Declaration of Thomas E. Stephens, MD in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 64 Declaration of Amanda Skinner in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 63 Declaration of Magda Schaler-Haynes in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 62 Declaration of Dr. Gabrielle Ross, PhD, MPH, MIA in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 61 Declaration of Helene Rimberg in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 60 Declaration of Melanie S. Reece, Ph. D. in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 59 Declaration of Karyl T. Rattay, M.D., M.S. in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 58 Declaration of Rachel Preiss, NP in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 57 Declaration of Karen Nelson in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 56 Declaration of Honor MacNaughton, MD in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 55 Declaration of Ruth Lytle-Barnaby, MSW in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 54 Declaration of Shannon Lightner in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 53 Declaration of Kathyleen Kunkel in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 52 Declaration of Mark Keenan in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 51 Declaration of Breena Holmes in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 50 Declaration of Beth Handler in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 49 Declaration of Katie Gillespie in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 48 Declaration of Meagan Gallagher in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 47 Declaration of John J. Drew, MBA in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 46 Declaration of Lisa M. David in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 45 Declaration of Dr. Blair Darney in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 Declaration of Margret R. Cooke, Esquire in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 43 Declaration of Dr. Jennifer Childs-Roshak, MD, MBA in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 42 Declaration of Deanna Charest in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Jody Camp in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 Declaration of Melisa Byrd in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Joan Brandt in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Bruce S. Anderson, Ph.D. in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Joseph L. Alifante in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 36 Declaration of Dr. Nicole Alexander-Scott in Support of States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 .) (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate for Pretrial Proceedings. Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 18, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance of Andrew M. Bernie appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Bernie, Andrew)
March 15, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance of Michelle S. Kallen appearing on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia Filed by on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia. (Kallen, Michelle)
March 15, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance of Eleanor Spottswood appearing on behalf of State of Vermont Filed by on behalf of State of Vermont. (Spottswood, Eleanor)
March 14, 2019 Filing 71 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference: Preliminary Injunctions are due by 3/21/2019. Responses are due by 4/11/2019. Replies are due by 4/19/2019. Oral Argument regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 is set for 4/23/2019 at 01:00PM in Portland Courtroom 13A before Judge Michael J. McShane. Out of State Counsel may appear by telephone. The Court will provide the telephone conference call-in number by separate email. Christina L. Beatty-Walters, Scott J. Kaplan, Lisa Landau, Matthew Colangelo, Ming-Qi Chu, Kate Matsuschak, Jeff Conner, Maura Whelan, Elizabeth Morris, Leigh Richie, Kirshon Ilona, Joanna Suder, Maria Lenz, Amanda Hainsworth, Eric Olson and Jen Weaver, Megan McKenzie, Anthony Sukkar, Valery Nannery, Michael J. Fischer, Diane Taira, Jill Nagamine, Angela Tokuda, Elspeth Faiman Hans, Brittany M. Jones present as counsel for plaintiffs. R. Charlie Merritt and Daniel Riess present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (cp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey P. Dunlap appearing on behalf of State of Maryland Filed by on behalf of State of Maryland. (Dunlap, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance of R. Charlie Merritt appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Merritt, R.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance of Heidi Parry Stern appearing on behalf of State of Nevada Filed by on behalf of State of Nevada. (Stern, Heidi)
March 13, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance of Maria R. Lenz appearing on behalf of State of Rhode Island Filed by on behalf of State of Rhode Island. (Lenz, Maria)
March 13, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance of Joannna S. Suder appearing on behalf of State of Delaware Filed by on behalf of State of Delaware. (Suder, Joannna)
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance of Ilona M. Kirshon appearing on behalf of State of Delaware Filed by on behalf of State of Delaware. (Kirshon, Ilona)
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service upon Office of Population Affairs served on 3/6/2019 Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service upon United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 3/6/2019 Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service upon Diane Foley served on 3/6/2019 Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service upon Alex M. Azar, II served on 3/6/2019 Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Status Conference is set for 3/14/2019 at 12:00PM by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call-in number by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Maura FJ Whelan appearing on behalf of State of Wisconsin Filed by on behalf of State of Wisconsin. (Whelan, Maura)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Diane K. Taira appearing on behalf of State of Hawaii Filed by on behalf of State of Hawaii. (Taira, Diane)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Angela A. Tokuda appearing on behalf of State of Hawaii Filed by on behalf of State of Hawaii. (Tokuda, Angela)
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Jill T. Nagamine appearing on behalf of State of Hawaii Filed by on behalf of State of Hawaii. (Nagamine, Jill)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance of Leigh J. Richie appearing on behalf of State of Illinois Filed by on behalf of State of Illinois. (Richie, Leigh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Amanda Hainsworth appearing on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts Filed by on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Hainsworth, Amanda)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Michael J. Fischer appearing on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Filed by on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Fischer, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 8/5/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons to Alex M. Azar II Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons to United States Department of Health and Human Services Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons to Office of Population Affairs Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to Diane Foley, M.D. Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Lisa Landau appearing on behalf of State of New York Filed by on behalf of State of New York. (Landau, Lisa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth Morris appearing on behalf of State of Illinois Filed by on behalf of State of Illinois. (Morris, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Valerie M. Nannery appearing on behalf of District of Columbia Filed by on behalf of District of Columbia. (Nannery, Valerie)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Brittany M. Jones appearing on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia Filed by on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia. (Jones, Brittany)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of Matthew Colangelo appearing on behalf of State of New York Filed by on behalf of State of New York. (Colangelo, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by State of Oregon. (Beatty-Walters, Christina)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5759458. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by State of Oregon against Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, Office of Population Affairs, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Beatty-Walters, Christina) Modified on 3/5/2019 to add payment information. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Oregon et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Megan J. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Maura Murphy Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Eleanor Spottswood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Conner
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Represented By: Scott J. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Michelle S. Kallen
Represented By: Brittany M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: W. Eric Kuhn
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Elizabeth Morris
Represented By: Leigh J. Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Nikole N. Brock
Represented By: Michael J. Fischer
Represented By: Amber J. Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Amanda Hainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Maura FJ Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Valerie M. Nannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Fadwa A. Hammoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Maria R. Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Joannna S. Suder
Represented By: Ilona M. Kirshon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Kate Matuschak
Represented By: Ming-Qi Chu
Represented By: Lisa Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Jill T. Nagamine
Represented By: Angela A. Tokuda
Represented By: Diane K. Taira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Elspeth Faiman Hans
Represented By: Kimberly A. Cahall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Andrew M. Bernie
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Foley
Represented By: Andrew M. Bernie
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Andrew M. Bernie
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Population Affairs
Represented By: Andrew M. Bernie
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Oregon Medical Association
Represented By: Leonard A. Nelson
Represented By: Brian D. Vandenberg
Represented By: Mark A. Bonanno
Represented By: Erin G. Sutton
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Southwestern Oregon
Represented By: Albinas J. Prizgintas
Represented By: Kimberly A. Parker
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Joshua M. Koppel
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: American Medical Association
Represented By: Leonard A. Nelson
Represented By: Brian D. Vandenberg
Represented By: Mark A. Bonanno
Represented By: Erin G. Sutton
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: C.N.M. Michele P. Megregian
Represented By: Albinas J. Prizgintas
Represented By: Kimberly A. Parker
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Joshua M. Koppel
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Thomas N. Ewing, M.D.
Represented By: Albinas J. Prizgintas
Represented By: Kimberly A. Parker
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Joshua M. Koppel
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Columbia Willamette
Represented By: Albinas J. Prizgintas
Represented By: Kimberly A. Parker
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Joshua M. Koppel
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Albinas J. Prizgintas
Represented By: Kimberly A. Parker
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Joshua M. Koppel
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sacks
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Represented By: Madison Condon
Represented By: Matthew J. Kalmanson
Represented By: Jason A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of San Francisco
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kentucky (by and through its Governor)
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Chicago
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Houston
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Baltimore
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Flint
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Adolescent Health Medicine
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kansas
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of New York
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Seattle
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Santa Cruz
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Missouri
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Family Physicians
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Emre N. Ilter
Represented By: Amandeep Singh Sidhu
Represented By: T Reed Stephens
Represented By: Darian A. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of San Francisco
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Center for Law and Justice
Represented By: Jay Alan Sekulow
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Trautman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST
Represented By: Sarah E. Pitlyk
Represented By: Adam S. Hochschild
Represented By: Herbert G. Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Bloomington
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alabama
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Columbus
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Ohio
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Academics
Represented By: Emre N. Ilter
Represented By: Amandeep Singh Sidhu
Represented By: T Reed Stephens
Represented By: Darian A. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State Of Texas
Represented By: Benjamin M. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Oakland
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?