Wyatt B. et al v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Alec R., Norman N., Naomi B., Bernard C., Simon S., Kylie R., Noah F., Unique L., Wyatt B. and Ruth T.
Defendant: Fairborz Pakseresht, Marilyn Jones, Kate Brown, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht and Rebecca Jones Gaston
Intervenor: Steven J. Russell
Case Number: 6:2019cv00556
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Exclude Experts #114 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Experts #203 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss as Moot #109 , #230 , #232 , #252 , #253 , are DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify #64 is GRANTED. This action shall proceed as a class action with one General Class and three Subclass: the ADA Subclass, the SGM Subclass, and the Aging-out Subclass. Signed on 8/17/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Notice re Notice of Supplemental Authority, #273 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Supplemental Authority, #273 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Notice of Supplemental Authority re Motion to Dismiss #108 , Notice,, #209 , Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion - Miscellaneous #227 , Motion to Dismiss #232 , Notice, #221 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 , Notice,, #209 , Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion - Miscellaneous #227 , Motion to Dismiss #232 , Notice, #221 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McStay, P.)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Notice re Notice, #271 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority iso Defendants' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice, #271 .) (McStay, P.)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Notice re Motion - Miscellaneous #227 of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #227 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice,, #268 .) (McStay, P.)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Declaration of Harry B. Wilson in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Dkt. 252/253) and Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action (Dkt. 117/118). Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Wilson, Harry)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Dkt. 252/253) and Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action (Dkt. 117/118) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (Wilson, Harry)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Declaration of Harry B. Wilson in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Dkt. 252/253) and Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action (Dkt. 117/118). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Wilson, Harry)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Dkt. 252/253) and Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action (Dkt. 117/118) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Wilson, Harry)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Declaration of Harry B. Wilson in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Wilson, Harry)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 .) (Wilson, Harry)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Declaration of Harry B. Wilson in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Wilson, Harry)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 , Motion to Dismiss #252 .) (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Wilson, Harry)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants' Reply re Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #259 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Blaesing, Lauren)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Reply to Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims #253 Oral argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Reply to Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims #252 Oral argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims #253 , Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims #252 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Declaration of Lacey Andresen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 .) (Blaesing, Lauren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2022: #1 Attachment Exhibit 1) (cw).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Declaration of Lacey Andresen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #252 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #253 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #252 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Anna M. Joyce Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Notice of Appearance of William D. Miner, III appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs . Filed by Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., Ruth T.. (Miner, William)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Notice of Attorney Substitution: P. Andrew McStay, Jr is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Gregory A. Chaimov . Filed by Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., Ruth T.. (McStay, P.)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Supplement Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Factual Misstatement in Defendants' Motion for Interlocutory Review. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #227 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Reply to Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Redacted) #232 . Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Reply to Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Redacted) #232 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Supplement Objection. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #227 .) (Stenson, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims #109 , Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims #108 , Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Redacted) #232 , Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims #230 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on November 15, 2021 before Judge Ann Aiken. Court Reporter: Sara Wilson. . Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held before Judge Ann L. Aiken regarding Motion to certify class #64 by videoconference. The Court hears argument as stated on the record and takes the matter under advisement. Formal Written Opinion to follow. Thomas Stenson, Gregory Chaimov, Aarti Iyer, Anastasia Benedetto, Emily Cooper, Marcia Lowry, Paul Southwick - by phone present as counsel for plaintiffs. David Markowitz, Lauren Blaesing, Laura Salerno Owens, Vivek Kothari, Kelsie Crippen present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Sara Wilson. (ck)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER for production of transcript at government expense for the hearing held on 11/15/2021 before Judge Ann Aiken. Court Reporter: Sara Wilson. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Reply to Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #227 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Dawn Post Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action. (Related documents: Response in Opposition to Motion #117 , #118 .) Modified on 11/15/2021 to modify docket text and add document link. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (jw)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Redacted Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants Notice Of Supplemental Information In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Certify As A Class Action (DKT. 117/118) R. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice, #236 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 REDACTED Defendants Notice Of Supplemental Information In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Certify As A Class Action (DKT. 117/118) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants Notice Of Supplemental Information In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Certify As A Class Action (DKT. 117/118). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice,, #234 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 Defendants Notice Of Supplemental Information In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Certify As A Class Action (DKT. 117/118) Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Redacted). Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #232 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims (Redacted). Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #230 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Motion to Dismiss Additional Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal #227 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Kate Brown, Fariborz Pakseresht, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Rebecca Jones Gaston. (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion) (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Information. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice #223 .) (Chaimov, Gregory)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. The Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 01:00PM is VACATED. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #108 of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #108 of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, and Supporting Memorandum Complaint, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken regarding Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Oral Argument is set for 11/15/2021 at 09:00AM in Eugene by videoconference before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Motion is taken under advisement as of 11/15/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Erin Gallagher Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telehponic Status Conference held before Judge Ann L. Aiken. A further Status Conference is set for 10/27/2021 at 01:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Gregory Chaimov, Aarti Iyer, Anastasia Benedetto, Dawn Post, Emily Cooper, Marcia Lowry, Thomas Stenson present as counsel for plaintiffs. Anna Joyce, David Markowitz, Lauren Blaesing present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Kendra Steppler. (ck)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER: Granting Motion for Status Conference #210 . Status Conference is set for 10/4/2021 at 02:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #31 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed on 9/27/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice,, #213 .) (Chaimov, Gregory)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action (Dkt. #117 / #118 ) and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain (Dkt. #31 ). Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for more definite statement #31 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blaesing, Lauren) Modified on 9/9/2021 to update docket text to match document title. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (bd)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Notice of Related Case Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice,, #209 .) (Chaimov, Gregory)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Stipulated Motion for a Status Conference. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cooper, Emily)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Notice re Motion to Dismiss #108 , Motion to Dismiss #109 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion for more definite statement, #31 Defendants Notice Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Defendants Motion To Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Make More Definite And Certain (Dkt. 31) And Defendants Motion To Dismiss Moot Claims (Dkts. 108/109) Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 , Motion to Dismiss #109 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion for more definite statement, #31 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blaesing, Lauren)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Reply to Motion to exclude Defendants' Expert Testimony opposing Class Certification #203 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Exhibits 1 and 4 to Declaration of Vivek Kothari in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert Testimony Opposing Class Certification re Declaration, #206 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4) (Kothari, Vivek)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Declaration of Vivek Kothari in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert Testimony Opposing Class Certification. Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #203 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Kothari, Vivek)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Response in Opposition to Motion to exclude Defendants' Expert Testimony opposing Class Certification #203 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Kothari, Vivek)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Declaration of Dawn Post in support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Opposing Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #203 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Chaimov, Gregory)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Motion to exclude Defendants' Expert Testimony opposing Class Certification. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Declaration of Dawn Post in support of Reply to Motion to Certify Class. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #201 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Chaimov, Gregory)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Reply to Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Order by Judge Acosta: As settlement does not appear possible at this time, the settlement conferences set for 4/9/2021, 4/13/2021, 4/14/2021, 5/5/2021 and 5/14/2021 are STRICKEN. (pjg)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTES of Proceedings: Settlement Conference held on 4/6/2021 with Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. Marcia Lowry. Dawn Post, Emily Cooper, Gregory Chalmov present as counsel for plaintiffs. David Markowitz, Lauren Blaesing, Anna Marie Joyce, Nathan Burcham, Sheila Potter present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. (pjg)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #83 ; Granting Motion to Amend/Correct #90 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Settlement Conferences are SET for the following dates and times in Portland by videoconference before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta: Tuesday, April 6, 2021 from 8:00 AM to 12:00 PM; Friday, April 9, 2021 from 9:00 AM to 5:00 PM; Tuesday, April 13, 2021 from 8:00 AM to 3:00 PM; Wednesday, April 14, 2021 from 8:00 AM to 1:30 PM; Wednesday, May 5, 2021 from 9:00 AM to 5:00 PM (tentative); and Friday, May 14, 2021 from 9:00 AM to 5:00 PM. The videoconference information shall be provided to the parties prior to the conferences by email. (pjg)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #195 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Erin Gallagher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7866426 #195 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Erin Gallagher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7866426. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gallagher, Erin)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Third Declaration of David L. Kramer in Support of Motion to Intervene. Filed by STEVEN J. RUSSELL. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #169 .) (Kramer, David)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Declaration of James S. Smith in Support of Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Steven J. Russell's Motion to Intervene. Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Notice, #192 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion #171 Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Steven J. Russell's Motion to Intervene Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #171 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. The Status Conference set for 12/22/2020 at 03:00PM is VACATED. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Supplemental Supplement Briefing. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #158 .) (Stenson, Thomas)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Status Conference is reset from 12/18/2020 to 12/22/2020 at 03:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Status Conference is reset from 12/4/2020 to 12/18/2020 at 02:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT CLAIMS. Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Notice #186 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Notice OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT CLAIMS #108 . Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Blaesing, Lauren) Modified on 12/1/2020 to add document link. (jw)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT CLAIMS. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Notice, #184 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Notice OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT CLAIMS #108 . Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Blaesing, Lauren) Modified on 12/1/2020 to add document link. (jw)
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Status Conference is reset from 11/23/2020 to 12/4/2020 at 02:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #181 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Aarti Iyer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7504185. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Aarti Iyer is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #181 .) (ck)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Aarti Iyer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7504185 #181 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Status Conference is reset from 11/16/2020 to 11/23/2020 at 04:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #177 Sur-Reply to Motion, #178 Declaration. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached (the original PDF was not text searchable.) The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Second Declaration of David L. Kramer in Support of Motion to Intervene. Filed by STEVEN J. RUSSELL. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #169 .) (Kramer, David) (Main Document 178 replaced on 10/16/2020) (cw).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Sur-Reply Intervenor Steven J. Russell's Reply Memorandum in Support to Motion to Intervene to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Discovery #169 . Filed by STEVEN J. RUSSELL. (Kramer, David) (Main Document 177 replaced on 10/16/2020) (cw).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Status Conference is set for 11/16/2020 at 03:30PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Declaration of Greg Chaimov . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #174 .) (Chaimov, Gregory)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Response to Motion to Intervene to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Discovery #169 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Declaration of John Jaeger in Support of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Steven J. Russell's Motion to Intervene to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Discovery. Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #171 .) (Wilson, Harry)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Declaration of James Smith in Support of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Steven J. Russell's Motion to Intervene to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Discovery. Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #171 .) (Wilson, Harry)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Discovery #169 . Filed by Kate Brown, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fariborz Pakseresht. (Wilson, Harry)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Declaration of David L. Kramer with attached Exhibit "A". Filed by STEVEN J. RUSSELL. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #169 .) (Kramer, David)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Motion to Intervene to Modify Protective Order and Obtain Discovery. Filed by STEVEN J. RUSSELL. (Kramer, David)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Reply to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony #114 . Filed by All Defendants. (Wilson, Harry)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Reply to Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims #108 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Declaration of Greg Scott in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Joyce, Anna)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Reply to Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims #108 . Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Exhibits 3 to Lowry Declaration re Response in Opposition to Motion #160 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Exhibits Exhibit 5 to Lowry Declaration re Response in Opposition to Motion #160 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Notice of Appearance of Paul J.C. Southwick appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Declaration of Marcia Lowry . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #160 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11) (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony #114 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Declaration of Thomas Stenson . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #158 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3) (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims #109 , Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims #108 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Notice of Appearance of Vivek A. Kothari appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Kothari, Vivek)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: for Paul C. Southwick Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Brief for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action #107 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Rosemary Iavenditti in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Declaration of Rosemary Iavenditti in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Declaration of Lacey Andresen in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Declaration of Heidi Beaubriand in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Declaration of Jessica Bull in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Declaration of Jessica Bull in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Declaration of Julie Shaffer in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Declaration of Julie Shaffer in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Declaration of Timothy Kenney in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Declaration of Timothy Kenney in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Julie Collins, MSW LCSW in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Declaration of Julie Collins, MSW LCSW in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Kevin E. Cahill, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Declaration of Kevin E. Cahill, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Exhibits 15, 18, 22, and 45 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 45) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Exhibits 36-46 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 42, #8 Exhibit 43, #9 Exhibit 44, #10 Exhibit 45, #11 Exhibit 46) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Exhibits 31-35 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Exhibits 30, part 2 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, part 4, #2 Exhibit 30, part 5, #3 Exhibit 30, part 6, #4 Exhibit 30, part 7) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Exhibits 30, part 1 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, part 1, #2 Exhibit 30, part 2, #3 Exhibit 30, part 3) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Exhibits 21-29 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Exhibits 16-20 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Exhibits 7-15 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Exhibits 6 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, part 1, #2 Exhibit 6, part 2) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Exhibits 5 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, part 1, #2 Exhibit 5, part 2) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Exhibits 2-4 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, part 3, #4 Exhibit 1, part 4) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Exhibits 8 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, part 1, #2 Exhibit 8, part 2, #3 Exhibit 8, part 3, #4 Exhibit 8, part 4, #5 Exhibit 8, part 5, #6 Exhibit 8, part 6) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Exhibits 7 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Exhibits 6 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, part 1, #2 Exhibit 6, part 2, #3 Exhibit 6, part 3, #4 Exhibit 6, part 4, #5 Exhibit 6, part 5, #6 Exhibit 6, part 6, #7 Exhibit 6, part 7, #8 Exhibit 6, part 8, #9 Exhibit 6, part 9) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Exhibits 5 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, part 1, #2 Exhibit 5, part 2) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Exhibits 4 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, part 1, #2 Exhibit 4, part 2, #3 Exhibit 4, part 3, #4 Exhibit 4, part 4, #5 Exhibit 4, part 5, #6 Exhibit 4, part 6) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Exhibits 3 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, part 1, #2 Exhibit 3, part 2, #3 Exhibit 3, part 3, #4 Exhibit 3, part 4, #5 Exhibit 3, part 5, #6 Exhibit 3, part 6) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Exhibits 2 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, part 1, #2 Exhibit 2, part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, part 3, #4 Exhibit 2, part 4, #5 Exhibit 2, part 5) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action re Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, part 3) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify the Class #64 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Exhibits 3-4 to Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing re Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony #114 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #114 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #109 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Declaration of Shawnna Bennett in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #109 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #108 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Motion to Dismiss Moot Claims. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Brief for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice #104 .) (Joyce, Anna)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Pursuant to the parties' correspondence with the Court regarding Motion to Certify the Class #64 , defendants are to file their response by 8/3/2020 and plaintiffs are to file their reply by 9/3/2020. Motion is taken under advisement as of 9/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Southwick, Paul)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Pursuant to the parties' correspondence with the Court regarding Motion to Certify the Class #64 , defendants are to file their response by 7/1/2020 and plaintiffs are to file their reply by 8/3/2020. Motion is taken under advisement as of 8/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Rule 16 Conference held on 2/24/2020 before Judge Ann L. Aiken, Court Reporter Ryan White, telephone number 503-326-8184 or ryan_white@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER. See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 3/24/2020. Redaction Request due 4/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (White, Ryan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 02-24-2020 before Judge Hon. Aiken. . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on February 24, 2020 before Judge Aiken. Court Reporter: Ryan White. . Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held on 2/24/2020. Formal order with case deadlines to follow. Marcia Robinson Lowry, Dawn J. Post, Andrew McStay, and Thomas Stenson present as counsel for plaintiffs. David B. Markowitz, Lauren F. Blaesing, and Harry B. Wilson present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Ryan White. Judge Ann L. Aiken presiding. (pvh)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Declaration of Dawn J. Post . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Amend/Correct #90 .) (Stenson, Thomas) Modified on 2/26/2020, to add name for declaration. (cw).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Reply to Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Supporting Memorandum Scheduling,,, 41 #90 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Rule 16 Conference is set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 12A before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #94 Response in Opposition to Motion. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Response in Opposition to Motion to Redact Transcript of Proceedings,, #82 Motion to Redact Additional Information #86 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas) (Main Document 94 replaced on 2/19/2020) (cw).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Declaration of Greg A. Scott in Support of Defendants' Combined Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action and Response to Cross-Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Amend/Correct #90 , Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #83 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action and Response to Cross-Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Supporting Memorandum Scheduling,,, 41 #90 , Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action to Motion to Certify the Class #64 #83 . Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Declaration of Dawn J. Post in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, and Supporting Memorandum. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Amend/Correct #90 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8) (Southwick, Paul)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Supporting Memorandum Scheduling,,, 41 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Declaration of Dawn J. Post in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for An Extension. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #88 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14) (Southwick, Paul)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action to Motion to Certify the Class #64 #83 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED for date of 12/18/2019 before Judge Aiken, Court Reporter Jan Duiven, telephone number 541-431-4112. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. (jd)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Motion to Redact Transcript of Proceedings,, #82 Motion to Redact Additional Information. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript by Lauren F. Blaesing re Transcript of Proceedings,, #82 Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Related document(s): Transcript of Proceedings,, #82 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing in Support of Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #83 .) (Blaesing, Lauren)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify as Class Action to Motion to Certify the Class #64 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference held on 12/18/2019 before Judge Aiken, Court Reporter Jan Duiven, telephone number 541-431-4112. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 1/28/2020. Redaction Request due 2/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2020. (jd)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 12/18/2019 before Judge Aiken. Court Reporter: Jan Duiven. . Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Ann L. Aiken regarding permanently sealing Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry #67 . The Court hears argument as stated on the record and takes the matter under advisement. Formal Written Opinion to follow. Dawn Post, Marcia Lowry, Thomas Stenson present as counsel for plaintiffs. David Markowitz, Lauren Blaesing, Sheila Potter, Anit Jindal present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Jan Duiven. (ck)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Having considered the parties' submissions, and to the extent that requests are not moot, plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limitations #59 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion for Abatement #61 is DENIED. To date, the parties have moved forward expeditiously with discovery and briefing, and the Court finds no good cause at present to stay the current stipulated deadlines. A separate order on the pending dispositive motion shall be issued prior to the close of briefing on the Motion to Certify the Class. Ordered on 12/17/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion to Substitute a Party and Change Case Caption #58 . Jana McLellan, the Interim Director of Child Welfare at the Oregon Department of Human Services is replaced by Rebecca Jones Gaston, Director of Child Welfare at the Oregon Department of Human Services. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Declaration of Dawn J. Post in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motionto Permanently Seal Exhibit 3. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #76 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7) (Southwick, Paul)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Response in Opposition to Motion to Permanently Seal Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in Support of Named Plaintiff Children's Motion for Class Certification and to Have Plaintiffs Publicly Re-File a Redacted Version #75 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Motion to Permanently Seal Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in Support of Named Plaintiff Children's Motion for Class Certification and to Have Plaintiffs Publicly Re-File a Redacted Version. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Declaration of Rebecca K. Dodd In Support of Defendants' Motion to Permanently Seal Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in Support of Named Plaintiff Children's Motion for Class Certification and to Have Plaintiffs Publicly Re-File a Redacted Version. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, #72 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Declaration of Lauren F. Blaesing In Support of Defendants' Motion to Permanently Seal Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in Support of Named Plaintiff Children's Motion for Class Certification and to Have Plaintiffs Publicly Re-File a Redacted Version. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, #72 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Joyce, Anna)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Motion to Permanently Seal Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in Support of Named Plaintiff Children's Motion for Class Certification and to Have Plaintiffs Publicly Re-File a Redacted Version. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/18/2019 at 09:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. The parties shall call in to the conference. Conference call information will be provided by the Court in a separate entry. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Exhibits 1-7 attached to document #67 shall be sealed pending an in camera review . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) Modified to add document number on 12/11/2019 (ck).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Declaration of Dawn J. Post in support of Motion to Certify Class. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Southwick, Paul)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #67 Declaration (Exhibits 1-7). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Exhibits 1-7 contained personal identifier information and required redaction. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment (attachment 1 - Exhibits 1-7).The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-10, #3 Exhibit 11-16, #4 Exhibit 17-21, #5 Exhibit 22-26, #6 Exhibit 27-31) (Southwick, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2019) (cw).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Declaration of Thomas Stenson in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Southwick, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Declaration of Amy Miller in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #64 .) (Southwick, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Motion to Certify the Class . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Southwick, Paul)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Response in Opposition to Motion for an Abatement of the Class Certification Schedule and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension #61 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Declaration of Greg Scott . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #61 .) (Wilson, Harry)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Motion for an Abatement of the Class Certification Schedule and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Wilson, Harry)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Declaration of Marcia Robinson Lowry in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limitations for Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #59 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Southwick, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limitations for Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Stipulated Motion to Substitute a Party and Change Case Caption. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on October 1, 2019 before Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Court Reporter: Deborah Cook. . Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Class Certification #55 . Motion for class certification is due by 12/2/2019. Defendants' opposition to class certification is due by 3/2/2020. Plaintiffs' reply in support of class certification is due by 3/16/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Class Certification. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. The Court orders the parties to proceed with depositions of the minor plaintiffs' next friends as scheduled. Once completed, the Court shall address any remaining discovery issues dealing with the production of records from the next friends. Plaintiffs are not required to turn over any of the files discussed during the hearing at this time. Further, as discussed on the record, plaintiffs are not required to convey a related privilege log to defendants until after depositions are completed. The parties shall communicate with Judge Aiken's Chambers to submit any further disputes or schedule hearings with this Court. Dawn Post, Emily Cooper, Thomas Stenson present as counsel for plaintiffs. David Markowitz, Lauren Blaesing, Sheila Potter, Elleanor Chin present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Deborah Cook. (ck)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/1/2019 at 11:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. The parties shall call in to the conference. Conference call information will be provided in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ck)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order. The discovery dispute submitted by the parties through joint letter on September 23, 2019, is referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas Coffin for hearing and disposition. Ordered on 9/25/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' September 6, 2019 letter regarding their most recent discovery dispute. Having considered the arguments presented, and noting that defendants' representation that they will agree to extend other case deadlines as necessary, the Court orders that the deposition currently scheduled for September 16, 2019 be continued to a new date. The parties shall confer and set a mutually agreed upon date for the deposition to take place within thirty days of this order. The Court will set prompt status conferences to deal with any further disputes. The Court DENIES defendant's Motion for a Protective Order as moot #48 . Ordered on 9/12/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr) Modified on 9/12/2019 to correct a transcription error. (rdr).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 9/12/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (plb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order and Opinion. The total number of hours for non-expert deposition testimony is set initially at 100 hours per side. The Court will enter an Amended Protective Order which shall not change the agreed procedures for designation of information as confidential or AEO. The amended order shall allow the parties to use information derived from confidential reports in public filings in this litigation. Signed on 9/12/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (plb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Motion for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Ann L. Aiken. The disputed case management issues are discussed as stated on the record. The Court takes the matters of a protective order and the total number of hours for non-expert depositions per side under advisement. Formal Written Order to follow. Dawn Post, Marcia Lowry, Emily Cooper, Paul Southwick, Thomas Stenson present as counsel for plaintiffs. Anna Joyce, David Markowitz, Sheila Potter present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Deborah Cook. (ck)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Reply to Motion to Strike Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain #31 #37 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Reply in Support of to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain #31 . Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike to Motion to Strike Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain #31 #37 . Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Correct Caption #42 . Defendant Fairborz Pakseresht will be corrected to Fariborz Pakseresht. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed Motion to Correct Caption. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan #28 and adopts the proposed deadlines as follows: Motion for class certification is due by 10/8/2019. Defendants' opposition to class certification is due by 12/6/2019. Plaintiffs' reply in support of class certification is due by 12/20/2019. Discovery is to be completed by 4/1/2020. Expert reports are to be exchanged by 6/3/2020. Expert response reports are to be exchanged by 7/1/2020. Expert Discovery is to be completed by 7/15/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/7/2020. Responses to Dispositive Motions are due by 8/28/2020. Replies to Dispositive Motions are due by 9/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for a Protective Order #39 . Signed on 8/15/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Motion to Strike Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain #31 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - STRIKING the Settlement Conference date of 8/12/19, from Judge Acosta's calendar, as the parties do not wish to proceed in that direction at this time. (peg)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain #31 . Filed by Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., Ruth T.. (Southwick, Paul)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Kate Brown, Jana McLellan, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fairborz Pakseresht. (Blaesing, Lauren)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Ann L. Aiken. The parties report that their Rule 26(f) conference is scheduled for 7/30/2019 and they are planning on a trial date in October, 2020. The parties shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order for the Court's review. A further Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/6/2019 at 09:15AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. The parties shall call in to the conference. Conference call information will be provided by the Court in a separate entry. Dawn Post, Gregory Chaimov, Marcia Lowry, Emily Cooper present as counsel for plaintiffs. Carla Scott, David Markowitz, Laura Salerno Owens, Lauren Blaesing, Elleanor Chin present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Sara Wilson. (ck)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Declaration of Anna M. Joyce in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion for more definite statement, #31 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Joyce, Anna)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Make More Definite and Certain. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion to Substitute a Party and Change Case Caption #29 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulated Motion to Substitute a Party and Change Case Caption. Filed by All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Change of Address Filed by All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Association of Attorney Carla Scott,Sheila H. Potter for Kate Brown,Sheila H. Potter for Fairborz Pakseresht,Sheila H. Potter for Oregon Dept. of Human Services,Sheila H. Potter for Marilyn Jones. Filed by Kate Brown, Fairborz Pakseresht, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Marilyn Jones. (Scott, Carla)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/29/2019 at 09:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. The parties shall call in to the conference. Conference call information will be provided by the Court in a separate entry. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 7/25/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES of Proceedings: Second settlement conference session held by Judge Acosta. Case does not settle at this time. The third settlement conference session scheduled for July 12, 2019, is cancelled. The court will keep on its calendar the fourth settlement conference session scheduled for August 12, 2019, should the parties wish to reconvene at that time. Emily Cooper, Paul Southwick, Tom Stenson, Greg Chaimov, Marcia Lowry, Dawn Post and Chris Shank present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Lauren Blaesing, David Markowitz, Dustin Buehler, Carla Scott, Laura Salerno Owens, Joanne Southey and Sheila Potter present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. (peg) Modified on 7/12/2019 to correct duplicative initial entry.(peg)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES of Proceedings: Initial Settlement Conference held by Judge Acosta. ORDER: Additional Settlement Conference dates set for 7/11/19, 7/12/19 and 8/12/19, all starting at 9:00AM. Emily Cooper, Paul Southwick, Tom Stenson, Greg Chaimov, Marcia Lowry, Dawn Post present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Lauren Blaesing, David Markowitz, Dustin Buehler, Carla Scott, Laura Salerno Owens, Joanne Southey, Sheila Potter present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. (peg)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #22 . Answer is due by 7/25/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, and Supporting Memorandum Complaint, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Markowitz, David)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Appearance of Lauren F. Blaesing appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Blaesing, Lauren)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Harry B. Wilson appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Wilson, Harry)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Anna Marie Joyce appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Joyce, Anna)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Laura R. Salerno Owens appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of David B. Markowitz appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Markowitz, David)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING an initial Settlement Conference for Monday, June 24, 2019, in Judge Acosta's chambers on the 11th floor of the Mark O. Hatfield United States Courthouse, 1000 SW Third Avenue, Portland, Oregon 97204; Plaintiffs to arrive at 9:00AM and Defendants at 9:45AM. Subsequent sessions are reserved for a 9:00AM start times on Thursday, July 11th, Friday, July 12th, and Monday, August 12th. (peg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Anastasia Benedetto (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: abenedetto. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anastasia Benedetto for Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., and Ruth T. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5839007 issued. Signed on 5/6/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Marcia Robinson Lowry (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mrlowry. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marcia Robinson Lowry for Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., and Ruth T. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5838991 issued. Signed on 5/6/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Dawn J. Post (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: djpost. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dawn J. Post for Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., and Ruth T. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5838970 issued. Signed on 5/3/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anastasia Benedetto . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5839007. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marcia Robinson Lowry . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5838991. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dawn Post . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5838970. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Southwick, Paul)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaimov, Gregory)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Carla Scott appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Scott, Carla)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/14/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 9/13/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 4/16/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Naomi B., Wyatt B., Bernard C., Noah F., Unique L., Norman N., Alec R., Kylie R., Simon S., Ruth T.. (Southwick, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. (CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5813152 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Simon S., Kylie R., Ruth T., Naomi B., Noah F., Bernard C., Wyatt B., Alec R., Norman N., Unique L. against Kate Brown, Marilyn Jones, Oregon Dept. of Human Services, Fairborz Pakseresht. (Southwick, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt B. et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec R.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman N.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi B.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard C.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon S.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie R.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah F.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unique L.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt B.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth T.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Emily R. Cooper
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Paul J.C. Southwick
Represented By: Anastasia Benedetto
Represented By: Dawn J. Post
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: P. Andrew McStay, Jr.
Represented By: Aarti Iyer
Represented By: Erin Gallagher
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairborz Pakseresht
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Lauren F. Blaesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Jones
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Lauren F. Blaesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Brown
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Lauren F. Blaesing
Represented By: Sheila H. Potter
Represented By: Vivek A. Kothari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Dept. of Human Services
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Lauren F. Blaesing
Represented By: Sheila H. Potter
Represented By: Vivek A. Kothari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fariborz Pakseresht
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: Lauren F. Blaesing
Represented By: Sheila H. Potter
Represented By: Vivek A. Kothari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Jones Gaston
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: Lauren F. Blaesing
Represented By: Sheila H. Potter
Represented By: Vivek A. Kothari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Steven J. Russell
Represented By: David L. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?