Sandoval v. Poe et al
Plaintiff: Brandy Marie Sandoval
Defendant: Osborne, CCS - Correct Care Solutions, McIrvin, Deputy Eggleston, Deputy Kelly, Deputy Dwight, Deputy Wade, Deputy Poe, Douglas County Jail and Staff, Tracy, Deputy Childer's, Deputy Pierce and Sargeant Turner
Case Number: 6:2019cv00710
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order to Issue Process and Directing Service by the US Marshal. Signed on 7/1/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You.(Mailed order, USM forms and summonses to Pro Se party on 7/1/2019.) (dsg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Association of Attorney Aaron Hisel,Aaron Hisel for Eggleston,Aaron Hisel for Kelly,Aaron Hisel for Poe,Aaron Hisel for Osborne,Aaron Hisel for McIrvin,Aaron Hisel for Turner,Aaron Hisel for Pierce,Aaron Hisel for Wade,Aaron Hisel for Dwight. Filed by Eggleston, Kelly, Poe, Osborne, McIrvin, Turner, Pierce, Wade, Dwight. (Hisel, Aaron)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eggleston waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Kelly waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Poe waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Osborne waiver sent on 6/28/2019; McIrvin waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Turner waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Pierce waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Wade waiver sent on 6/28/2019; Dwight waiver sent on 6/28/2019. Filed by Eggleston; Kelly; Poe; Osborne; McIrvin; Turner; Pierce; Wade; Dwight. (Warren, Gerald)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Amended Complaint. Filed by Brandy Marie Sandoval against CCS - Correct Care Solutions, Childer's, Douglas County Jail and Staff, Dwight, Eggleston, Kelly, McIrvin, Osborne, Pierce, Poe, Turner, Wade. (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motions for Appointment of Counsel(ECF Nos. #8 and #9 ). Signed on 6/24/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/24/19.) (dsg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandy Marie Sandoval. (dsg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO DISMISS IN PART: The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint IN PART. Plaintiff's claims against the Douglas County Jail and Plaintiff's claim for release from custody are DISMISSED. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, curing the deficiencies noted above, within 30 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint within the time provided, this action will proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claims. Signed on 6/3/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/4/2019.) (joha)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jn)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 6/28/2019.(Mailed to Pro Se party and Douglas County Counsel on 5/29/19.) (dsg)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections, Central Trust Unit shall collect from Plaintiffs trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $15.00 and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that thereafter, the Oregon Department of Corrections, Central Trust Unit shall collect from Plaintiffs prison trust account the $335.00 balance of the filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 5/29/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se and ODOC party on 5/29/19.) (dsg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandy Marie Sandoval. (sb).
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/7/2019.) (jn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Brandy Marie Sandoval against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (jn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandy Marie Sandoval. (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Poe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osborne
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS - Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIrvin
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Eggleston
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Kelly
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Dwight
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Wade
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Poe
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Jail and Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Childer's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Pierce
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargeant Turner
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Represented By: Aaron Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Marie Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?