Porter v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Yolanda S. Porter
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00721
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance of Joseph John Langkamer appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Langkamer, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 5/28/2019, answer due on 9/25/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (bd)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: incorrect docket event selected for #9 ; entry will be corrected and Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated. (bd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 6/3/2019. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (bd) Modified on 6/17/2019 to correct docket text. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (bd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 5/28/2019. Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (bd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Service Papers Received. Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint, procedural order, and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service. (kf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 5/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge..
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (bd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Yolanda S. Porter. (Rebers, Robyn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Yolanda S. Porter against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Rebers, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Represented By: Joseph John Langkamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda S. Porter
Represented By: Robyn M. Rebers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?