Lytle v. Coquille Valley Hospital

Plaintiff: Lorraine Lytle
Defendant: Coquille Valley Hospital
Case Number: 6:2019cv00722
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Coquille Valley Hospital. (Barnwell, Francis)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Coquille Valley Hospital. (Barnwell, Francis)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #17 . Answer is due by 6/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Coquille Valley Hospital. (Barnwell, Francis)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notification of CM/ECF Account for David C. Leimbach (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dcleimbach. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Leimbach for Lorraine Lytle. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5867964 issued. Signed on 5/29/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for William M. Hogg (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: wmhogg. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of William M. Hogg for Lorraine Lytle. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5867950 issued. Signed on 5/29/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Carolyn H. Cottrell (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ccottrell. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carolyn H. Cottrell for Lorraine Lytle. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5867931 issued. Signed on 5/29/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Leimbach . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5867964. Filed by Lorraine Lytle. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Hogg . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5867950. Filed by Lorraine Lytle. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carolyn Cottrell . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5867931. Filed by Lorraine Lytle. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #6 Affidavit of Service. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document was missing a case caption cover page. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Coquille Valley Hospital served on 5/17/2019 Filed by Lorraine Lytle. (Sullivan, Dana) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/23/2019) (cw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Coquille Valley Hospital. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Lorraine Lytle. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/9/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5844852 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Lorraine Lytle against Coquille Valley Hospital (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sullivan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lytle v. Coquille Valley Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lytle
Represented By: Dana L. Sullivan
Represented By: William M. Hogg
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: David C. Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coquille Valley Hospital
Represented By: Maryann Yelnosky
Represented By: Jessica D. Osborne
Represented By: Francis T. Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?