Henderson et al v. Oregon Department of Human Services

Plaintiff: Patrick Louis Henderson and Christine Diane Henderson
Defendant: Oregon Department of Human Services
Case Number: 6:2019cv00724
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Judge Kasubhai's F&R #4 IN PART. Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies outlined in the F&R. The Court withholds entering a final order regarding Plaintiffs' IFP application until such time as Plaintiffs file an amended complaint. Signed on 7/2/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 7/3/2019.) (ck)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Complaint. Filed by Christine Diane Henderson as guardian for plaintiff Patrick Louis Henderson against Oregon Department of Human Services (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Exhibit Part 4, #6 Exhibit Part 5, #7 Exhibit Part 6, #8 Exhibit Part 7). (kf) Modified to correct file date to match stamp on document on 7/2/2019 (no parties to regenerate NEF to) (jk).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Exhibit to Pre Hearing Communication #7 . This filing includes a conventionally filed CD of 2018 DHS 09540 Patrick Henderson Audio Hearing 2/4/19. This conventional filing is maintained in the Clerk's Office but cannot be made a part of the court's electronic record in CM/ECF. Filed by Christine Diane Henderson. (kf)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Pre Hearing Communication filed by Christine Diane Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (kf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge and Guardianship paperwork. (kf)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Findings & Recommendation #4 is referred to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/12/2019.) (jk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiff's complaint should be DISMISSED and the Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis should be DENIED as moot. Plaintiff should be given thirty days to file an optional amended complaint. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 6/26/2019. Signed on 6/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/12/2019.) (jk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/20/19.) (kf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Christine Diane Henderson. (kf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Christine Diane Henderson for Patrick Louis Henderson and Christine Diane Henderson against Oregon Department of Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (kf) Modified text for filer/signer clarification on 5/9/2019. (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Oregon Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Louis Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Diane Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?