Bay v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kaytlin L. Bay
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00727
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (eo)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge..
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 5/13/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Kaytlin L. Bay. (Taylor, Katie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Kaytlin L. Bay against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Taylor, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaytlin L. Bay
Represented By: Katherine Eitenmiller
Represented By: Katie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?