Atrio Health Plans, Inc. et al v. Performance Health Technology, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Cascade Comprehensive Care, Inc., Mid Valley IPA, Inc., Atrio Health Plans, Inc. and Umpqua Health, LLC
Defendant: Performance Health Technology, Ltd. and Optima, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00818
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Overpayments under the Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration of Nathan Perrizo ISO ISO Defendant PH Tech's Reply ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #26 .) (Stoller, Heidee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Thomas R. Johnson ISO Defendant PH TECH's Reply ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #26 .) (Stoller, Heidee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Heidee Stoller ISO PH TECH's Reply ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #26 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Stoller, Heidee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 Reply In Support to Motion to Compel Arbitration #10 . Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Stoller, Heidee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - [Proposed] Order Sealing Exhibits 7-13 to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sieving, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 Declaration of Richard N. Sieving in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits 7-13 to the Complaint Under Seal. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #23 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sieving, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits 7-13 to the Complaint Under Seal. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sieving, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 Reply in Support of Motion to Remand / Reply to Defendants' Opposition and Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #13 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sieving, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration of Richard N. Sieving in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to PH Tech's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #20 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Sieving, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration #10 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sieving, Richard)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #13 Oral Arguement requested. Filed by Optima, LLC. (Turnbow, Wm.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #13 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Stoller, Heidee)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion to file documents under seal #8 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Based upon the agreement of the parties, Defendants' Response Brief to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court #13 is due by 6/19/2019. Plaintiffs' Reply Brief is due by 7/8/2019. Plaintiff's Response Brief to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration #10 is due by 6/26/2019. Defendant's Reply Brief is due by 7/12/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Richard N. Sieving in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to Marion County Circuit Court. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #13 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sieving, Richard)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sieving, Richard)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Thomas R. Johnson ISO Defendant Performance Health Technology's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Related document(s): Motion to compel #10 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Johnson, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Nathan Perrizo ISO Defendant Performance Health Technology's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Related document(s): Motion to compel #10 .) (Johnson, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Johnson, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Thomas R. Johnson ISO in Camera Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #8 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Johnson, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion in camera for leave to file documents under seal. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Johnson, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiffs ATRIO HEALTH PLANS, INC., MID VALLEY IPA, INC. dba WVP Health Authority; CASCADE COMPREHENSIVE CARE, INC. and UMPQUA HEALTH, LLC. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sieving, Richard)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Richard N. Sieving (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rsieving. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard N. Sieving for Atrio Health Plans, Inc., Cascade Comprehensive Care, Inc., Mid Valley IPA, Inc., Umpqua Health, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5865712 issued. Signed on 5/28/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard N. Sieving . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5865712. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McClure, Michelle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd.. (Johnson, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV19095 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5865633 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Performance Health Technology, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Johnson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atrio Health Plans, Inc. et al v. Performance Health Technology, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Comprehensive Care, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle K. McClure
Represented By: Richard N. Sieving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid Valley IPA, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle K. McClure
Represented By: Richard N. Sieving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atrio Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle K. McClure
Represented By: Richard N. Sieving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umpqua Health, LLC
Represented By: Michelle K. McClure
Represented By: Richard N. Sieving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Health Technology, Ltd.
Represented By: Heidee Stoller
Represented By: Thomas R. Johnson
Represented By: Courtney Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optima, LLC
Represented By: Wm. Randolph Turnbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?