Worden v. Kelly

Petitioner: Vance Wallace Worden
Respondent: Superintendent Brandon Kelly
Case Number: 6:2019cv00898
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Kristen E. Boyd . Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #12 .) (Boyd, Kristen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 . Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Boyd, Kristen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Anthony D. Bornstein is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Vance Wallace Worden. (Bornstein, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Boyd, Kristen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brandon Kelly. Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Larsen, Lynn)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 8/9/2019. Signed on 6/10/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (dsg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel #3 is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. Signed on 6/10/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/10/19.) (dsg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that petitioners Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The petition may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 6/10/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/10/19.) (dsg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Vance Wallace Worden regarding Case Assignment Notice #4 . (jn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Vance Wallace Worden. (jn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Vance Wallace Worden against Brandon Kelly. (jn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Vance Wallace Worden. (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worden v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Brandon Kelly
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vance Wallace Worden
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Anthony D. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?