Clark v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Richard W. Clark
Defendant: Mediation Case Manager and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01020
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant Mediation Case Manager's Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Mediation Case Manager. (McKelvey, Lowell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Kevin H. Kono . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #18 .) (Kono, Kevin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #16 Oral Argument requested. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #12 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Richard W. Clark. (bd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Richard W. Clark. (bd)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Kevin H. Kono in Support of Request for Judicial Notice. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #12 , Request #13 .) (Kono, Kevin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5907238. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Susan Prudhomme Related Doc #5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 . Answer is due by 7/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/8/2019.) (plb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /Respond to Complaint Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond #7 to Complaint states that defendant's counsel conferred with "counsel for plaintiff." However, plaintiff is unrepresented. The motion also appears incomplete with its certificate of compliance. The court denies the motion without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /Respond to Complaint Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kono, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 2 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Aguiar, Ashlee)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Richard W. Clark of Discovery Order #3 . (bd)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 7/8/2019. (ljp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV22814 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5907272 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet). (Aguiar, Ashlee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediation Case Manager
Represented By: Christopher R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Frederick B. Burnside
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Aguiar
Represented By: Kevin H. Kono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?