Whitney et al v. McCarthy Holthus, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Robert Whitney and Michelle Whitney
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, McCarthy Holthus, LLP and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01035
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . Answer is due by 9/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer / Plead in Response to Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Laurick, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint,, . Filed by McCarthy Holthus, LLP. (Thomas, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company served on 7/11/2019, answer due on 8/1/2019; McCarthy Holthus, LLP served on 7/11/2019, answer due on 8/1/2019; Nationstar Mortgage, LLC served on 7/11/2019, answer due on 8/1/2019. (Piteo, Theodore)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of James P. Laurick appearing on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC Filed by on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Laurick, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of John M. Thomas appearing on behalf of McCarthy Holthus, LLP Filed by on behalf of McCarthy Holthus, LLP. (Thomas, John)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/29/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/29/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 7/1/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5910329 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Robert Whitney, Michelle Whitney against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, McCarthy Holthus, LLP, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Deutsche Bank, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Nationstar, #6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - McCarthy Holthus). (Piteo, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney et al v. McCarthy Holthus, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy Holthus, LLP
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Whitney
Represented By: Theodore J. Piteo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Whitney
Represented By: Theodore J. Piteo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?