Rousseau v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Rousseau
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2019cv01096
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Case electronically transferred out to the District of Southern Indiana. Other Court Case Number 1:19-cv-06098 assigned. (dsg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Pursuant to MDL 2570, Docket No. 505. Certified on 7/29/19 by Deputy Clerk Melanie Carmichael of the Southern District of Indiana. (dsg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-66) finalized on 7/29/19. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/29/19. (dsg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Notice of Removal Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Cook Medical LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D). (Yoshida, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019 to correct text(cw).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order: Rule 16 Conference is set for 9/10/2019 at 09:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by separate order. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/13/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/13/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (kf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV52056 from Deschutes Co. Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5927063 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Cook Medical LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Yoshida, Michael). (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rousseau v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Rousseau
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?