Sparks v. Laney
Petitioner: Patrick Allen Sparks
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2019cv01262
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 12/2/2019. Signed on 9/26/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/1/2019.) (joha)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This Court denies Sparks' Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ), with leave to renew after Respondent files an answer and responsive brief or if the Court schedules an evidentiary hearing. Signed on 9/26/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/1/2019.) (joha)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Response to Order #9 . Filed by Patrick Allen Sparks. (joha)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This Court DENIES Sparks' Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #8 ). Sparks shall file the requisite $5.00 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. The failure to do so shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding for failure to prosecute. Signed on 9/9/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/10/2019.) (joha)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Patrick Allen Sparks. (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 85281 issued. (fp)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: this Court DENIES Petitioner's application. Petitioner may file an amended application curing this deficiency within thirty days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the Case No. 6:19-cv-01262-IM. Petitioner is advised that the failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding for lack of prosecution. Signed on 8/26/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 8/26/2019.) (dsg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/13/14.) (eo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/12/2019.) (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Patrick Allen Sparks. (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Patrick Allen Sparks against Garrett Laney. (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Patrick Allen Sparks. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Allen Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?