Reneau v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Appellant: Christopher Lee Reneau
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01267
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeals Rule 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Appellants Brief and Excerpt of Record. Filed by Christopher Lee Reneau. Appellees brief is due by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Excerpt of Record, #2 Attachment ER 1-445) (Fuller, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Appeal Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (plb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Transmittal of Record for Bankruptcy Appeal. (plb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (plb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court. Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 18-06077-tmr. The Filling Fee was paid at the Bankruptcy Court. (Attachment: #1 Optional Statement of Election to District Court by Appellee) (plb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court 1 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election 1 were incorrectly docketed. Docket entry # 1 is stricken. The Clerk is ordered to correctly docket the Notice of Appeal and the Optional Statement of Election. (plb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reneau v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christopher Lee Reneau
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Christopher A. Morehead
Represented By: James M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?