Bowman v. High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacey Bowman
Defendant: High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01291
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:207
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.. (Driscoll, Sean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Filed by Stacey Bowman against High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.. (Rush, Kirsten)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Answer is due by 9/13/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Sean Driscoll ISO unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #10 .) (Driscoll, Sean)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Driscoll, Sean)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Demand for Jury Trial by Stacey Bowman . Filed by Stacey Bowman. (Rush, Kirsten)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 9/5/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Sean Driscoll ISO Unopposed Motion for Extension of time. Filed by High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #6 .) (Driscoll, Sean)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.. (Driscoll, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/19/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.. (Driscoll, Sean)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Sean M. Driscoll in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Docket of Circuit Court Case No. 19CV29137) (Driscoll, Sean)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV29137 from Deschutes Circuit Court. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5965067. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Driscoll, Sean) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add payment information. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert Aggregate & Paving, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Bowman
Represented By: Kirsten N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?