Young et al v. United States Department of Commerce
Plaintiff: Amber Young and Clayton Young
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Case Number: 6:2019cv01352
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed (Pickett, J.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons/Service Return #5 , Summons Issued, #4 Filed by Amber Young, Clayton Young. (Pickett, J.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Return of Service Executed as to United States Department of Commerce served on 9/6/2019, answer due on 9/27/2019. (Pickett, J.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Commerce. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pickett, J.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/24/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/23/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5975848 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Amber Young, Clayton Young against United States Department of Commerce (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Pickett, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Young
Represented By: J. Randolph Pickett
Represented By: R. Brendan Dummigan
Represented By: Peter O. Hansen
Represented By: Kimberly O. Weingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Young
Represented By: J. Randolph Pickett
Represented By: R. Brendan Dummigan
Represented By: Peter O. Hansen
Represented By: Kimberly O. Weingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?