Pearson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nicholas D. Pearson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv01621
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Nicholas D. Pearson. (kms)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Nicholas D. Pearson. (kms)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Objections to Findings & Recommendation #5 . Filed by Nicholas D. Pearson. (jk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jk)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Findings & Recommendation #5 is referred to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/15/2019.) (jk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Findings & Recommendation: The Court recommends that Plaintiff's Complaint #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice, and Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 and Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel #3 be DENIED. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 10/29/2019. Signed on 10/15/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/15/2019.) (jk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/10/2019.) (jw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Nicholas D. Pearson. (jw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Nicholas D. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nicholas D. Pearson against United States of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?