Evers v. Lane County Adult Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Denver Esolde Galligo Evers
Defendant: Lane County, Lane County Adult Corrections and Lane County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 6:2019cv01732
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Denver Esolde Galligo Evers. (kf)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 Application to Proceed IFP filed by Denver Esolde Galligo Evers. (kf)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The application #3 is DENIED. Plaintiff may file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. The amended application must bear the Case No. 6: 19-cv-0l 732-MO. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 12/4/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 12/5/2019.) (dsg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Denver Esolde Galligo Evers. (kms)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/29/19.) (kf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed IFP filed by Denver Esolde Galligo Evers. (kf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Denver Esolde Galligo Evers against All Defendants. (kf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Denver Esolde Galligo Evers against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evers v. Lane County Adult Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Esolde Galligo Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County Adult Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?