Blackwell v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bryon Gabriel Blackwell
Defendant: Discover Bank, Does 1 through 100, Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01763
Filed: November 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 12/5/2019. Filed by Bryon Gabriel Blackwell. (Schumacher, Kyle)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Discover Bank. (Davidson, Clifford)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Discover Bank. (Davidson, Clifford)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 Answer to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Poling, Colin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/14/2019, answer due on 12/5/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to TransUnion, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due on 12/10/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to Discover Bank served on 11/19/2019, answer due on 12/10/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Jesus Miguel Palomares appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. Filed by on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Palomares, Jesus)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Colin C. Poling (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ccpoling. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colin C. Poling for TransUnion, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6104415 issued. Signed on 12/2/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (ck)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin C. Poling . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6104415. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Pilar C. French appearing on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (French, Pilar)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Brian T. Kiolbasa appearing on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Service by Bryon Gabriel Blackwell Filed by Bryon Gabriel Blackwell. (Schumacher, Kyle)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Discover Bank. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America, N.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/2/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
November 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) Filed by Bryon Gabriel Blackwell. (Schumacher, Kyle)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6066786 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Bryon Gabriel Blackwell against Bank of America, N.A., Discover Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jesus Miguel Palomares
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Represented By: Colin C. Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon Gabriel Blackwell
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?