Barnholdt v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Barnholdt
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv01831
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 12/9/2019, answer due on 4/7/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Wicklund, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Leisa A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Wolf, Leisa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge..
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (bd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Edward A. Wicklund (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: eawicklund. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Wicklund for Margaret Ann Barnholdt. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6081872 issued. Signed on 11/14/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ck)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A. Wicklund . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6081872. Filed by Margaret Ann Barnholdt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of admitted courts) (Bordelon, Jeremy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6081870. Filed by Margaret Ann Barnholdt against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Bordelon, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnholdt v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Barnholdt
Represented By: Jeremy L. Bordelon
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Leisa A. Wolf
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?