Young v. Richards
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Officer Richards
Case Number: 6:2019cv01924
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 49:10101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Huguette Nicole Young (Pro Se Filer admission). Your login is: hnyoung. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (CM/ECF Registered User). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (cp)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Plaintiff moves to proceed in forma pauperis. Based upon this application, the Court concludes that Plaintiff is capable of paying the $400.00 filing fee without undue hardship. Accordingly, Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED with leave to refile if Plaintiff submits additional financial information as proof of undue hardship. Plaintiff shall submit either an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis or otherwise submit the requisite filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to submit either the amended application or the filing fee shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/2/2020.) (jk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (kf)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/26/2019.) (bd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (bd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young against Officer Richards (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?