Long, et al v. Pacific Women's Center, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Emi C Long, Emi C Farley, Kirk P Farley, Emi C. Long, Kirk P. Farley and Emi C. Farley
Defendant: DO John Ngo, Pacific Women's Center, LLC, MD Arin Braseth, Bayer Healthcare, LLC, MD Richard Beyerlein, MD Corey Sullivan, Bayer Medical Care, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Providence St. Joseph Health, Providence Health & Services - Washington and Providence Health & Services
Case Number: 6:2019cv01942
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 28 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #15 upon Corey Sullivan served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 27 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 26 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #7 upon Bayer Healthcare, LLC served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 25 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #9 upon Bayer Medical Care, Inc. served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #14 upon Providence Health & Services - Washington served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #12 upon Providence St. Joseph Health served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #13 upon Providence Health & Services served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #10 upon Richard Beyerlein served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #11 upon Pacific Women's Center, LLC served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Erika Lyn Wilson appearing on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC Filed by on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Wilson, Erika)
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Gordon L. Welborn appearing on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC Filed by on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Welborn, Gordon)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Ngo. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Arin Braseth. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Corey Sullivan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence Health & Services - Washington. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence Health & Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence St. Joseph Health. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Pacific Women's Center, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Beyerlein. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayer Medical Care, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayer Healthcare, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6102504. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Robert Wagner. Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (ljp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 3 . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Emi C. Long, Kirk P Farley in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 12/12/2019. (nd)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/31/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6102542 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emi C Long, Kirk P Farley against Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc., Richard Beyerlein, Arin Braseth, John Ngo, Pacific Women's Center, LLC, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wagner, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long, et al v. Pacific Women's Center, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi C Long
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi C Farley
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk P Farley
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi C. Long
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk P. Farley
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi C. Farley
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO John Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Women's Center, LLC
Represented By: Erika Lyn Wilson
Represented By: Gordon L. Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Arin Braseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Richard Beyerlein
Represented By: Erika Lyn Wilson
Represented By: Gordon L. Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Corey Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Medical Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St. Joseph Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services - Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?