Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America v. Savage
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Defendant: Lou Savage
Case Number: 6:2019cv01996
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service upon Lou Savage served on 12/20/2019 Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Cramer, David)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #18 . Answer is due by 2/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Filed by Lou Savage. (Weston, Sarah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Allon S. Kedem (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: askedem. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allon S. Kedem for Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6115920 issued. Signed on 12/10/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Elisabeth S. Theodore (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: estheodore. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elisabeth S. Theodore for Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6115916 issued. Signed on 12/10/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for R. Stanton Jones (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rsjones. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Stanton Jones for Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6115912 issued. Signed on 12/10/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jeffrey L. Handwerker (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jlhandwerker. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey L. Handwerker for Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6115898 issued. Signed on 12/10/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allon S. Kedem . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6115920. Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elisabeth S. Theodore . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6115916. Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert S. Jones . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6115912. Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey L. Handwerker . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6115898. Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/9/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/7/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/7/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/7/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6114577 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America against Lou Savage (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hoffman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America v. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By: David W. Cramer
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Handwerker
Represented By: Allon S. Kedem
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?