Johnson v. M&M Excavating, LLC
Plaintiff: William K. Johnson
Defendant: M&M Excavating, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00196
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by M&M Excavating, LLC. (Williams, Brian)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed Filed by M&M Excavating, LLC. (Williams, Brian)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to M&M Excavating, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/4/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6232277 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by William K Johnson against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Springer, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. M&M Excavating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William K. Johnson
Represented By: Adam C. Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&M Excavating, LLC
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Tomas Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?