Cunningham v. Waddell et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Cunningham
Defendant: Waddell and Kasper Charters, LLC, Robert Paul Waddell and Sherry Lynn Kasper
Case Number: 6:2020cv00207
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Marine Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan #13 and adopts the proposed deadlines as follows: The deadline for joining additional parties is 6/5/2020. Discovery is to be completed by 9/15/2020. The parties shall exchange expert disclosures and reports by 9/30/2020. Rebuttal expert reports shall be exchanged by 10/30/2020. Expert depositions shall be completed by 11/15/2020. Discovery and Dispositive Motions are due by 11/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Nicole Cunningham. (Williams, Douglas)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Sherry Lynn Kasper, Robert Paul Waddell, Waddell and Kasper Charters, LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Waddell and Kasper Charters, LLC. Filed by All Defendants. (Waller, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Thomas G. Waller appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Waller, Thomas)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 28, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Douglas R. Williams). Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6340147 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Douglas R. Williams). Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6340147. Filed by Nicole Cunningham. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Sherry Lynn Kasper served on 2/10/2020 Filed by Nicole Cunningham. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Robert Paul Waddell served on 2/13/2020 Filed by Nicole Cunningham. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon Waddell and Kasper Charters, LLC served on 2/10/2020 Filed by Nicole Cunningham. (Neidzwski, Nicholas) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct date of service (jn).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 2/10/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/9/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/9/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jn)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. for Personal Injuries Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6245393 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nicole Cunningham against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons - Robert Paul Waddell, #3 Proposed Summons Summons - Sherry Lynn Kasper, #4 Proposed Summons Summons - Waddell and Kasper Charters, LLC). (Neidzwski, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Waddell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddell and Kasper Charters, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paul Waddell
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lynn Kasper
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Cunningham
Represented By: Nicholas J. Neidzwski
Represented By: Douglas R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?