Allstate Insurance Company v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc., Defendant Walmart Inc. and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00462
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 requested by attorney Brent Moffett, and Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 requested by attorney Steve T. Moffett. (jk)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Steve T. Moffett Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6481440 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Brent Moffett Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6481408 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 requested by attorney Thomas L. Vitu. (jk)
April 24, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Thomas L. Vitu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6481432 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Brent Moffett, Thomas L. Vitu, and Steve T. Moffett are required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before these motions may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 .) (ck)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference. Discovery is to be completed by 10/28/2020. Initial Disclosures must be completed by 5/7/2020. Exchange of Expert Disclosures must be completed by 11/20/2020. Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Disclosures must be completed by 12/4/2020. Expert Discovery to be completed by 1/29/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/26/2021. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 2/26/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 3/25/2021 if no dispositive motions filed. George Shumsky (by telephone) present as counsel for plaintiff. David Cramer (by telephone); Tom Vitu (by telephone) present as counsel for defendants. Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (jk)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Brent Moffett, Thomas L. Vitu, and Steve T. Moffett are required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before these motions may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 .) (ck)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Shumsky, George)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Steve T. Moffett Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6481440. Filed by All Defendants. (Cramer, David)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Thomas L. Vitu Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6481432. Filed by All Defendants. (Cramer, David)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Brent Moffett Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6481408. Filed by All Defendants. (Cramer, David)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/7/2020 at 10:45AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The Court will initiate the call. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. (jk)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/7/2020 at 10:45AM in Eugene Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The Court will initiate the call. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. (jk)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Walmart Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Hoffman, Jonathan)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 7/20/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/17/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 8/17/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV07265 from Douglas County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6423824 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Walmart Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, proofs of service, summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hoffman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Cramer
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Represented By: Thomas Vitu
Represented By: Brent Moffett
Represented By: Stephen T. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Walmart Inc.
Represented By: David W. Cramer
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hoffman
Represented By: David W. Cramer
Represented By: Thomas Vitu
Represented By: Brent Moffett
Represented By: Stephen T. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: George M. Shumsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?