Anthony v. Laney
Petitioner: Ryan Lawrence Anthony
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2020cv00511
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Boyd, Kristen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Petitioner's IFP Application #1 is DENIED AS MOOT where he previously paid the filing fee for this action. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Answer is due by 6/19/2020. Signed on 4/20/2020 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition)(Mailed to Pro Se party on 4/20/2020.) (dsg)
April 6, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 88265 issued. (re)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/27/2020.) (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Ryan Lawrence Anthony. (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Ryan Lawrence Anthony against Garrett Laney. (dsg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Ryan Lawrence Anthony. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Lawrence Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?