Fallon Trading Co., Inc. et al v. Roth
Petitioner: Fallon Trading Co., Inc. and Amanda Fallon
Respondent: Michael Roth
Case Number: 6:2020cv00608
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Michael Roth Filed by Amanda Fallon, Fallon Trading Co., Inc.. (Carlisle, Joseph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Marco A. Hernandez to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and transferred to the Eugene Division. (eo)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/12/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award and Entry of Final Judgment Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6532682. Filed by Fallon Trading Co., Inc., Amanda Fallon against Michael Roth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Independent Contractor Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Carlisle, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallon Trading Co., Inc. et al v. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fallon Trading Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W. Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amanda Fallon
Represented By: Joseph W. Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?