Martinez et al v. Professional Reforestation of Oregon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Rodriguez and Carlos Martinez
Defendant: Daniel Robertson and Professional Reforestation of Oregon, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00659
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Professional Reforestation of Oregon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/1/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marin, Lizeth)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Daniel Robertson waiver sent on 5/1/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marin, Lizeth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Complaint . Filed by Carlos Martinez, Antonio Rodriguez against All Defendants. (Marin, Lizeth)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Defendants Daniel Robertson and Professional Reforestation of Oregon, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Professional Reforestation of Oregon) (jw)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/21/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (plb)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Civil Case Assignment Order 3 Clerical errors have been discovered in the case record. The following corrections were made to the record: Docket Entry 3 is stricken from the record and a corrected Civil Case Assignment Order will be filed. (plb)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6571284 . Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Carlos Martinez, Antonio Rodriguez against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Marin, Lizeth) Modified to correct text for receipt number on 4/22/2020 (sss).
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marin, Lizeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Professional Reforestation of Oregon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Reforestation of Oregon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Rodriguez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Lizeth Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Martinez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Lizeth Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?