Chemeketa Students for Life et al v. Hector et al
Plaintiff: Emma Howell, Marcos Sanchez and Chemeketa Students for Life
Defendant: Jackie Franke, Jessica Howard, Mike Evans, Manuel Guerra, Jim Eustrom, Joel Gisbert, Ron Pittman, Diane Watson, neva hutchinson, Ed Dodson, Betsy Earles and Ken Hector
Case Number: 6:2020cv00742
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 32 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Diane Watson waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 31 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ron Pittman waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Neva Hutchinson waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 29 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jessica Howard waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 28 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ken Hector waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 27 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Manuel Guerra waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 26 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joel Gisbert waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 25 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jackie Franke waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Mike Evans waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 23 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jim Eustrom waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Betsy Earles waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ed Dodson waiver sent on 5/14/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 Michael R. Ross. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655784. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 Tyson C. Langhofer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655801. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2 David A. Cortman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655760. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to Diane Watson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ron Pittman. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Neva Hutchinson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jessica Howard. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ken Hector. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Manuel Guerra. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Joel Gisbert. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jackie Franke. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mike Evans. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jim Eustrom. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Betsy Earles. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ed Dodson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael R. Ross. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655784 #3 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tyson C. Langhofer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655801 #4 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Cortman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655760 #2 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 10/5/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
May 6, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. David A. Cortman, Michael R. Ross, and Tyson C. Langhofer are required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before these motions may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2 .) (ck)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tyson C. Langhofer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655801. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael R. Ross. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655784. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Cortman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6655760. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6651732 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Marcos Sanchez, Emma Howell, Chemeketa Students for Life against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Attachment Declaration of Emma Howell, #23 Attachment Declaration of Marcos Sanchez, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 Attachment Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Proposed Summons Ken Hector, #27 Proposed Summons Ron Pittman, #28 Proposed Summons Ed Dodson, #29 Proposed Summons Neva Hutchinson, #30 Proposed Summons Jackie Franke, #31 Proposed Summons Diane Watson, #32 Proposed Summons Betsy Earles, #33 Proposed Summons Jessica Howard, #34 Proposed Summons Jim Eustrom, #35 Proposed Summons Manuel Guerra, #36 Proposed Summons Mike Evans, #37 Proposed Summons Joel Gisbert). (Hill, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemeketa Students for Life et al v. Hector et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Eustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Gisbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: neva hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Earles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Howell
Represented By: Daniel A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Sanchez
Represented By: Daniel A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemeketa Students for Life
Represented By: Daniel A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?