Hollins v. Hendricks
Plaintiff: Kirk Harrison Hollins
Defendant: Kimberly Hendricks
Case Number: 6:2020cv00750
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed Filed by Kimberly Hendricks. (Hallman, Andrew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 6/15/2020.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/19/2020. Complaint #2 and this Notice Emailed to ODOJ on 5/19/2020.) (joha)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND TO COLLECT FILING FEE: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order and waiver of service packets to Assistant Attorney General Andrew Hallman. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections shall collect from plaintiff's prison trust account the $350.00 filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of the Court according to the formula set forth above. The payments shall be clearly identified by the name and number assigned to this action. Signed on 5/15/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party and ODOC on 5/19/2020.) (joha)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/7/2020.) (dsg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Kirk Harrison Hollins against Kimberly Hendricks. (dsg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kirk Harrison Hollins. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollins v. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hendricks
Represented By: Andrew D. Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Harrison Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?