Brown v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Glenn C. Brown
Defendant: Holly Jewkes, Gary Farnsworth, United States Forest Service (USDA), United States Forest Service and Oregon Department of Transportation
Case Number: 6:2020cv00829
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1471
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/26/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 10/26/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 05/29/2020.) (jw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Certificates of Services by Glenn C. Brown - to Oregon Department of Transportation, and: #1 Gary Farnsworth, #2 United States Forest Service, #3 Holly Jewkes) Filed by Glenn C. Brown. (jw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Glenn Brown in Support of Motion. Filed by Glenn C. Brown. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (jw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause and Memorandum in Support of its Motion for an Order to Show Cause and in Support of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Glenn C. Brown. (jw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (jw).
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Glenn C. Brown against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Jewkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service (USDA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?