New Earth Biosciences, LLC v. Terra Ridge Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: New Earth Biosciences, LLC
Defendant: Terra Ridge Farms, LLC and Terra Gold Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01264
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Confirmation of Transmittal of Case to Marion County Circuit Court via OJD website. (jw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and certified copy of Order on motion to remand 17 to Marion County Circuit Court. (jw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED. (ck)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Remand #15 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Michael B. Merchant in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Remand. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #15 .) (Merchant, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by All Defendants. (Merchant, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 Demand for Jury Trial by New Earth Biosciences, LLC . Filed by New Earth Biosciences, LLC. (Folawn, Colin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff New Earth Biosciences, LLC. Filed by New Earth Biosciences, LLC. (Folawn, Colin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance of Anna M. Helton appearing on behalf of New Earth Biosciences, LLC Filed by on behalf of New Earth Biosciences, LLC. (Helton, Anna)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 . Answer is due by 8/21/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of Michael B. Merchant . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #9 .) (Merchant, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Merchant, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7056146. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Remi A. Baptiste Related Doc #6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/4/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Merchant, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Terra Gold Farms, Inc. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 8/13/2020. (nd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/3/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (plb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Merchant, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV22732 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7056146 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Terra Gold Farms, Inc., Terra Ridge Farms, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Michael B. Merchant, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Merchant, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Earth Biosciences, LLC v. Terra Ridge Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Ridge Farms, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Colley
Represented By: Michael B. Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Gold Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Colley
Represented By: Michael B. Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Earth Biosciences, LLC
Represented By: Colin J. Folawn
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?