Oregon Bankers Association et al v. State of Oregon et al
Plaintiff: Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, Bank of Eastern Oregon and People's Bank of Commerce
Defendant: State of Oregon, Director of DCBS Andrew Stolfi, Ellen Rosenblum and Andrew Stolfi
Case Number: 6:2020cv01375
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Titled as DEFENDANTS' FRCP 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Ketterling, Keith)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion Setting Time for Defendants to Appear #10 . Defendants shall enter their first appearance by 9/29/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Tim Cunningham in Support of Unopposed Motion Setting Time for Defendants to Appear. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #10 .) (Cunningham, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion Setting Time for Defendants to Appear. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cunningham, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cunningham, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Andrew Stolfi on 8/18/20 by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. Waiver of Service is due by 10/13/2020. Filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. (Cunningham, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Ellen Rosenblum on 8/18/20 by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. Waiver of Service is due by 10/13/2020. Filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. (Cunningham, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to State of Oregon on 8/18/20 by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. Waiver of Service is due by 10/13/2020. Filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. (Cunningham, Timothy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rosenblum, #2 Summons Stolfi) (jw)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/15/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/14/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/13/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon, Lewis & Clark Bank, Oregon Bankers Association, People's Bank of Commerce. (Cunningham, Timothy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7108049. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon Bankers Association, Bank of Eastern Oregon, People's Bank of Commerce, Lewis & Clark Bank against Ellen Rosenblum, State of Oregon, Andrew Stolfi (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons State of Oregon, #3 Proposed Summons Ellen Rosenblum, #4 Proposed Summons Andrew Stolfi). (Cunningham, Timothy) Modified docket text to add payment information on 8/13/2020 (eo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon Bankers Association et al v. State of Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis & Clark Bank
Represented By: Christopher J.K. Swift
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Bankers Association
Represented By: Christopher J.K. Swift
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Eastern Oregon
Represented By: Christopher J.K. Swift
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's Bank of Commerce
Represented By: Christopher J.K. Swift
Represented By: Gregory A. Chaimov
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Steven C. Berman
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of DCBS Andrew Stolfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Rosenblum
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Steven C. Berman
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Stolfi
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Steven C. Berman
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?