Ford v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ian Ford
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2020cv01399
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 8/18/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Jeremy Ian Ford. (Kerr, Kevin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Jeremy Ian Ford against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Kerr, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ian Ford
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?