Pearson v. Oregon State Hospital
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dale Pearson
Defendant: Oregon State Hospital
Case Number: 6:2020cv01401
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 is GRANTED. Plaintiff'sMotion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is DENIED with leave to renew if this case proceeds. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended complaint shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding, with prejudice. Signed on 10/9/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/9/2020.) (dsg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/18/2020.) (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Nicholas Dale Pearson. (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Nicholas Dale Pearson against Oregon State Hospital (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Nicholas Dale Pearson. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Oregon State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dale Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?