LEEP, Inc. v. Nordstrom
Plaintiff: LEEP, Inc.
Defendant: John Nordstrom
Case Number: 6:2020cv01673
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion Hearing held on September 28, 2020, before Judge Michael J. McShane, Court Reporter Jill L. Jessup, telephone number (503)326-8191 or email at jill_jessup@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter at (503)326-8191 or email at jill_jessup@ord.uscourts.gov or PACER. See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 10/30/2020. Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2021. (jjcr)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by John Nordstrom waiver sent on 10/7/2020. Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Arthur, Randy)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties that the arbitration be allowed to continue, but that the resulting decision of the arbitrator should be delayed pending expedited resolution of the issue regarding the validity of the actions taken during the August 31, 2020 special meeting, Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #2 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion seeking injunctive relief prohibiting arbitration from proceeding as scheduled is denied. However, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the Court will issue a written injunction staying release of the arbitrators final decision pending further order from this Court. The parties conferred and further agree: (i) pending this Courts determination of these matters, neither party will disparage the other; (ii) Defendant will not take any settlement action regarding arbitration matters until 30 days after this courts determination of these matters; (iii) Plaintiff will take no shareholder or board action until after the hearing and this Courts determination of these matters. The parties shall confer regarding an expedited briefing schedule to determine Nordstrom's current authority to act as Leep's CEO. Signed on 10/8/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 as to James E. Griffith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Signed on 9/30/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Arthur, Randy)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James E. Griffith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7282622 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties that the arbitration be allowed to continue, but that the resulting decision of the arbitrator should be delayed pending expedited resolution of the issue regarding the validity of the actions taken during the August 31, 2020 special meeting, Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #2 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion seeking injunctive relief prohibiting arbitration from proceeding as scheduled is denied. However, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the Court will issue a written injunction staying release of the arbitrators final decision pending further order from this Court. The parties conferred and further agree: (i) pending this Courts determination of these matters, neither party will disparage the other; (ii) Defendant will not take any settlement action regarding arbitration matters until 30 days after this courts determination of these matters; (iii) Plaintiff will take no shareholder or board action until after the hearing and this Courts determination of these matters. Randy Lee Arthur and James E. Griffith present as counsel for plaintiff. Frank J. Godrey, III present as counsel for defendant.(Court Reporter Jill Jessup.)Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (cp)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Nordstrom. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/26/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/25/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of W. Scott Record in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L) (Arthur, Randy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Oral Argument regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 is set for 9/28/2020 at 02:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call in information by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Frank J. Godfrey, III appearing on behalf of John Nordstrom Filed by on behalf of John Nordstrom. (Godfrey, Frank)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James E. Griffith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7282622. Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Arthur, Randy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declaration of James E. Griffith . Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Arthur, Randy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Declaration of Randy Heinig . Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Arthur, Randy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Declaration of Randy L. Arthur . Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of W. Scott Record) (Arthur, Randy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by LEEP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arthur, Randy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7282542 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by LEEP, Inc. against John Nordstrom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - OR SoS Record, #2 Exhibit B - First Am. Complaint for Arbitration, #3 Exhibit C - Bylaws, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F - Sept 17 2020 AAA Email, #7 Exhibit G - Letter to Zielke Law Firm, #8 Exhibit H - Mot. to Accept Notice of Appearance, #9 Exhibit I - Objection from Zielke Law, #10 Exhibit J - Second Arbritration Refusal, #11 Exhibit K - Scott Records Log, #12 Exhibit L - Notice of Special Shareholders Meeting, #13 Exhibit M - Refusal From Transfer Agent, #14 Exhibit N - Cert & Tabulation of Votes, #15 Exhibit O - Notice of Removal, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons). (Arthur, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEEP, Inc. v. Nordstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nordstrom
Represented By: Frank J. Godfrey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEEP, Inc.
Represented By: Randy Lee Arthur
Represented By: James E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?