Bondick v. Rios
Plaintiff: Robert Bondick
Defendant: R. Rios
Case Number: 6:2020cv01884
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Based on the record, this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed on 12/28/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/28/2020.) (cp)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Opinion and Order: Because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claim of negligence against a city employee, this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed on 12/28/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/28/2020.) (cp)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/03/2020.) (bd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Robert Bondick against R. Rios (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). No filing fee paid or IFP filed. (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bondick v. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bondick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?