Powell v. Well Path Care et al
Plaintiff: Jon Paul Powell
Defendant: Stephanie Ridgley, Josh O'Hara, Mrs. Gardner, Deputy McClure and Well Path Care
Case Number: 6:2020cv01934
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Issue Process and Directing Service by the US Marshal. Signed on 12/22/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut.(Mailed order, USM form and summons form to Pro Se party on 12/22/2020.) (dsg)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 1/21/2021.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/22/2020.)(Mailed complaint and notice of lawsuit to Lane County Counsel.) (dsg)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The Court GRANTS Powell's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 . The Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC) shall collect payments from Powell's trustaccount and forward the funds to the Clerk of Court. Signed on 12/22/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party and ODOC on 12/22/2020.) (dsg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Jon Paul Powell. (dsg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/9/2020.) (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jon Paul Powell. (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Jon Paul Powell against Gardner, McClure, Josh O'Hara, Stephanie Ridgley, Well Path Care. (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jon Paul Powell. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Well Path Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Paul Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Ridgley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Path Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?