Blaser v. Weiss
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lee Blaser
Defendant: William P. Weiss
Case Number: 6:2021cv00403
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by William P. Weiss. (Schanz, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 5/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by William P. Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time) (Schanz, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to William P. Weiss served on 4/1/2021, answer due on 4/22/2021. (Holley, Meredith)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 3/16/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to William P. Weiss. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/14/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/13/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/13/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7993788 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jennifer Blaser against William P Weiss (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Holley, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaser v. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lee Blaser
Represented By: Meredith A. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Weiss
Represented By: Daniel R. Schanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?