N.H. v. Bell Real Estate, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NH and N.H.
Defendant: Pinewood Properties, LLC, Richard Sorric and Bell Real Estate, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00450
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Richard Sorric. (Daly, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Pinewood Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendant Pinewood Properties, LLC.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Daly, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Bell Real Estate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendant Bell Real Estate, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Daly, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Service by N.H. Filed by N.H.. (Holley, Meredith)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Pinewood Properties, LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due on 5/3/2021. (Holley, Meredith)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Bell Real Estate, Inc. served on 4/12/2021, answer due on 5/3/2021. (Holley, Meredith)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by N.H.. (Holley, Meredith)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Sorric. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Pinewood Properties, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bell Real Estate, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/23/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/23/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8005418 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by NH against Bell Real Estate, Inc., Pinewood Properties, LLC, Richard Sorric (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Holley, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.H. v. Bell Real Estate, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinewood Properties, LLC
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Esfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sorric
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Esfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Esfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NH
Represented By: Meredith A. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.H.
Represented By: Meredith A. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?