Hart et al v. J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miles Hart and Elizabeth Tanenbaum
Defendant: J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc., J.H. Baxter & Co., A California Limited Partnership and J.H. Baxter & Co.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00663
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Crystal S. Chase appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by J.H. Baxter & Co., J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.. (Chase, Crystal)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance of Brad S. Daniels appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by J.H. Baxter & Co., J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.. (Daniels, Brad)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Per A. Ramfjord appearing on behalf of J.H. Baxter & Co., J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc. . Filed by J.H. Baxter & Co., J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.. (Ramfjord, Per)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sheets, Laura)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 requested by attorney Laura L. Sheets, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 requested by attorney Lance T. Spitzig, and Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 requested by attorney Steven D. Liddle are GRANTED. (jk)
May 21, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Lance T. Spitzig. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089680 #7 ; Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Laura L. Sheets. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089671 #6 ; Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Steven D. Liddle. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089827 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Steven D. Liddle. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089827. Filed by Miles Hart, Elizabeth Tanenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Bar Admissions) (Liddle, Steven)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Lance T. Spitzig. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089680. Filed by Miles Hart, Elizabeth Tanenbaum. (Spitzig, Lance)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Laura L. Sheets. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089671. Filed by Miles Hart, Elizabeth Tanenbaum. (Sheets, Laura)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order signed on 5/4/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to J.H. Baxter & Co. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/31/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/30/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8065525 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Miles Hart, Elizabeth Tanenbaum against J.H. Baxter & Co., A California Limited Partnership, J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Kahl, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart et al v. J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. Baxter & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. Baxter & Co., A California Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. Baxter & Co.
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Hart
Represented By: Nicholas A. Kahl
Represented By: Laura L. Sheets
Represented By: Lance T. Spitzig
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tanenbaum
Represented By: Nicholas A. Kahl
Represented By: Laura L. Sheets
Represented By: Lance T. Spitzig
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?